Aguon et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Steve Hagen, Michael Cuasito, Rudy Paco, Vicente Perez, Benny Baza, Greyorio Cruz, Francisco C Duenas, Andrew R Mesa, Ray Taitague, William Castro, Edward Terlaje, Raymond Aguon, Van W Murer, David G Cepeda, Lewis Santos, Delfino V Garcia, James T Linnel, Randy Sablan, Alfred C Ignacio, Anthony Quinene, Mark Merfalen, Johnny Arceo and Michael Roberto
Defendant: Dynax Corporation, The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C., E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Co., Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products LP, National Foam Inc, The Chemours Company, Kidde-Fenwal Inc and Chemguard Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv03057
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE ADDENDUM TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. In addition to counsel preparing and submitting all proposed orders in Word document format via email to chambers at gergel_ecf@scd.uscourts.gov, please include the master MDL docket entry number of the motion filed (and spread to applicable member case(s)) in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG to which the proposed order relates. Please reference within the proposed order in Word document format as well as the subject line of the email to chambers. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. SECOND NOTICE regarding Counsel should prepare and submit all proposed orders in Word document format via email to chambers at gergel_ecf@scd.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David B Dwerlkotte on behalf of E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, EI Du Pont de Nemours & Co, The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C., E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Co., E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, E I Du Point De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company LLC, EI Du Pont de Nemours and Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dwerlkotte, David)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Guam, 1:19-cv-00141, Aguon et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:19-cv-3057-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 6 (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 11/1/2019 12:30 PM, in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Guam; Case Number 1:19-cv-00141. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 Conditional Transfer Order to U.S. District Court for the District of South Carolina for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Issued on 10/17/2019. (fad, ) [Transferred from Guam on 10/29/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge (fad, ) [Transferred from Guam on 10/29/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number GUX015792 re #1 Complaint (fad, ) [Transferred from Guam on 10/29/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice of Fee due - Filing Fee of $400.00 due by 3:00 p.m. Friday, October 4, 2019.. (fad, ) [Transferred from Guam on 10/29/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 Cover Sheet, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Berman, Michael) [Transferred from Guam on 10/29/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PaymentDue.), filed by All Plaintiffs. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 11/12/2019.(Berman, Michael) [Transferred from Guam on 10/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguon et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Hagen
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cuasito
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy Paco
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicente Perez
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny Baza
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greyorio Cruz
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco C Duenas
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew R Mesa
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Taitague
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Castro
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Terlaje
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Aguon
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van W Murer
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David G Cepeda
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Santos
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delfino V Garcia
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James T Linnel
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Sablan
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred C Ignacio
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Quinene
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Merfalen
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Arceo
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Roberto
Represented By: Michael J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C.
Represented By: David B Dwerlkotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Co.
Represented By: David B Dwerlkotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Represented By: David B Dwerlkotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?