Kenney v. Allura USA LLC et al
Plaintiff: Karen Kenney
Defendant: Elementia S.A.B. de C.V., Allura USA LLC, Plycem USA LLC and Elementia USA Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv03070
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. The Moving Defendants' deadline to respond will be March 7, 2020. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 12/23/2019.(jbry, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To answer or otherwise respond by Allura USA LLC, Elementia USA Inc, Plycem USA LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/3/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Katz, Leah)
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2 (CMO 2): Leadership. This Order Relates to All Actions. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on December 17, 2019. Associated Cases: 2:19-mn-02886-DCN et al.(kwhe, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING Status Conference set for Monday, 12/16/2019 at 1:30 PM cancelled and rescheduled to: Status Conference set for Tuesday, 12/17/2019 at 9:00 AM in Hon. Sol Blatt, Jr., Courtroom, J. Waties Waring Judicial Cntr, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable David C Norton. Associated Cases: 2:19-mn-02886-DCN et al.(jbry, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING Status Conference set for Monday, 12/16/2019 at 11:00 AM cancelled and rescheduled to: Status Conference set for Monday, 12/16/2019 at 1:30 PM in Hon. Sol Blatt, Jr., Courtroom, J. Waties Waring Judicial Cntr, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable David C Norton. ****NOTE: TIME CHANGE ONLY****Associated Cases: 2:19-mn-02886-DCN et al.(jbry, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE to Attorneys regarding MDL Transfer (jbry, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 5:19-cv-01226. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #4. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed; ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of South Carolina for inclusion into MDL-2886 ALLURA FIBER CEMENT SIDING PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. Case to be assigned to the Hon. David C. Norton, U.S. District Judge. (plp, ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/30/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER approving #7 Stipulation and granting request for extension of time for defendants Elementia USA, Inc. and Plycem USA LLC to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint to 12/23/2019. The Rule 16 initial conference and associated deadlines remain as set at this time. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/24/2019. (sg ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/30/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time To Answer,Move,Or Otherwise Plead In Response To The Complaint by Elementia USA, Inc., Plycem USA LLC submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. (Harrison, Samuel) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/30/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Elementia USA, Inc., Plycem USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Elementia S.A.B. de C.V., for Elementia USA, Inc., Plycem USA LLC.. (Harrison, Samuel) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/30/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel David Harrison on behalf of Elementia USA, Inc., Plycem USA LLC (Harrison, Samuel) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/30/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement; Attorney Jason P. Sultzer, Esq. and Attorney Joseph Lipari, Esq. Phone number is 845-483-7100. Admissions due by 10/17/2019. (pjh) Modified on 10/4/2019 {Served via regular mail on 10/3/2019} (pjh). [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/30/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial telephone Conference set for 1/2/2020 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/26/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/30/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Allura USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Plycem USA LLC, #2 Summons Issued as to Plycem USA Inc, #3 Summons Issued as to Elementia USA Inc, #4 Summons Issued as to Elementia S.A.B. De C.V.)(pjh) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/30/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Allura USA LLC, Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A.B. De C.V. and Plycem USA LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4893263) filed by Karen Kenney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh)[Transferred from New York Northern on 10/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenney v. Allura USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elementia S.A.B. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allura USA LLC
Represented By: Leah Greenberg Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plycem USA LLC
Represented By: Samuel David Harrison
Represented By: Leah Greenberg Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elementia USA Inc
Represented By: Samuel David Harrison
Represented By: Leah Greenberg Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Kenney
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: Adam R. Gonnelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?