Carranza et al v. Cuccinelli et al
Plaintiff: Aracely Alexandra Andra Carranza, Manuel Antonio Andrade Carranza, Manuel Antonio Andrade Portillo and Dalila Carranza Romero
Defendant: To be named, Ken Cuccinelli and Donald Neufeld
Case Number: 2:2019cv03078
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William H Jordan on behalf of Ken Cuccinelli (Jordan, William)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Ken Cuccinelli, Donald Neufeld, To be named. Service due by 02/20/2020. (hada, ) Modified to add service deadline on 11/14/2019 (hada, ).
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER After Plaintiff Manuel Antontio Andrade Carranza filed a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, the filing fee was paid. Therefore, his motion #2 is terminated as moot. The Clerk of Court shall issue the summons. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 11/13/2019.(hada, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number SCX200016761. (hada, )
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The Court takes no action on Andrade Carranza's IFP motion at this time. Further details set forth in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 11/06/2019. (hada, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Aracely Alexandra Andra Carranza, Manuel Antonio Andrade Carranza, Manuel Antonio Andrade Portillo, Dalila Carranza Romero.(hada, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Aracely Alexandra Andra Carranza, Manuel Antonio Andrade Carranza, Manuel Antonio Andrade Portillo, Dalila Carranza Romero. Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(hada, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ken Cuccinelli, Donald Neufeld, To be named, filed by Manuel Antonio Andrade Carranza, Manuel Antonio Andrade Portillo, Aracely Alexandra Andra Carranza, Dalila Carranza Romero.(hada, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carranza et al v. Cuccinelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aracely Alexandra Andra Carranza
Represented By: Dana S Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Antonio Andrade Carranza
Represented By: Dana S Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Antonio Andrade Portillo
Represented By: Dana S Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalila Carranza Romero
Represented By: Dana S Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: To be named
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: William H Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Neufeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?