Privette v. Waste Pro of North Carolina Inc
Plaintiff: Kenneth Privette
Defendant: Waste Pro of North Carolina Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv03221
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Continue Hearing scheduled for February 18, 2020 by Waste Pro of North Carolina Inc. Response to Motion due by 1/21/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Johnson, George)
December 26, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #3 Second MOTION Equitable Tolling , #5 First MOTION Conditional Cert : Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2020 11:00 AM in Hon. Sol Blatt, Jr., Courtroom, J. Waties Waring Judicial Cntr, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable David C Norton. (eric, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 First MOTION Conditional Cert Response filed by Kenneth Privette. (LeClercq, Ben)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 First MOTION Conditional Cert Replies due by 12/19/2019. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 12/18/2019.(jbry, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Kenneth Privette. Response to Motion due by 12/31/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(LeClercq, Ben)
December 10, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 First MOTION Conditional Cert Response filed by Waste Pro of North Carolina Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/17/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Johnson, George)
December 9, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 Second MOTION Equitable Tolling Response filed by Kenneth Privette. (LeClercq, Ben)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Second MOTION Equitable Tolling Response filed by Waste Pro of North Carolina Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/9/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Johnson, George)
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 9 Reason: Incorrect main document filed. Corrected filing made as entry #10. Corrected Filing Document Number #10 (jbry, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Waste Pro of North Carolina Inc.(Johnson, George)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 First MOTION Conditional Cert Response to Motion due by 12/10/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 11/26/2019.(jbry, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 First MOTION Conditional Cert by Waste Pro of North Carolina Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Johnson, George)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document #5 First MOTION Conditional Cert. First attachment description: Exhibit A Notice . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form, #2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit DOL Investigation of Waste Pro, #4 Exhibit Darrell Bomeisler Declaration, #5 Exhibit Trial Excerpt, #6 Exhibit Trial Transcript Andreu v WPFL, #7 Exhibit Direct Exam of WP HR Rep, #8 Exhibit Compliance Action Report, #9 Exhibit FLSA Narrative Report)(LeClercq, Ben) (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/20/2019) (jbry, ). Modified on 11/20/2019 to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user (jbry, ).
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION Conditional Cert by Kenneth Privette. Response to Motion due by 12/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(LeClercq, Ben) Modified on 11/20/2019 to create linkage to #6 Additional Attachments filed 11/19/2019 (jbry, ).
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT Fourth against All Defendants, filed by Kenneth Privette. Service due by 2/13/2020 (LeClercq, Ben)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Second MOTION Equitable Tolling by Kenneth Privette. Response to Motion due by 12/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(LeClercq, Ben)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to file respective amended complaints within 21 days from the date of this text Order. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on November 14, 2019. Associated Cases: 2:17-cv-02654-DCN, 2:19-cv-03221-DCN(cdan, )
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER denying 178 Motion (in 2:17-cv-02654-DCN) to Dismiss and ordering parties to sever in accordance with this ORDER. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 11/12/2019. (jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Privette v. Waste Pro of North Carolina Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Pro of North Carolina Inc
Represented By: Matthew J Pearce
Represented By: Amy S Tingley
Represented By: George Craig Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Elouise Belbeck
Represented By: J Scott Hudson
Represented By: Robert J Stovash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Privette
Represented By: Charles Ryan Morgan
Represented By: Paul M Botros
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Represented By: David Dale Ashley
Represented By: Ben LeClercq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?