Dabney et al v. Bank of America NA et al
Interested Party: Bankruptcy Court
Appellee: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Bank of America NA and The Bank of New York Mellon
Appellant: Frank Scott Dabney and Kathryn Harrelle Dabney
Case Number: 2:2019cv03225
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 Transcript of Bankruptcy Proceedings Hearing held on 6/19/2019 on Motion to Extend Time to Complete Discovery Filed by Frank Scott Dabney, Kathryn Harrelle Dabney, First Motion to Compel as to All Defendants Filed by Frank Scott Dabney, Kathryn Harrelle Dabney; Hearing held on 7/25/2019 on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, LLC, Defendant BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. and Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Defendant Bank of New York Mellon c/o Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. on 6/19/2019 and 7/25/2019, before Judge Waites, re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Transcript may be viewed via the Bankruptcy docket or at the Bankruptcy Court. (Attachments: #1 Transcript of June 19, 2019, #2 Transcript of July 25, 2019)(sphipps-USBK, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Amend: It is ordered that the new briefing schedule is as follows: Appellants' brief due February 13, 2020, Appellees' brief due April 13, 2020, and Appellants' reply brief due April 27, 2020. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 12/18/2019.(vdru, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 4 Bankruptcy Scheduling Notice,, by Frank Scott Dabney, Kathryn Harrelle Dabney. Response to Motion due by 12/31/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Luck, Jason)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 BANKRUPTCY SCHEDULING NOTICE. The Designation of Record on Appeal from the United States Bankruptcy Court was filed in this court on 12/12/2019. The Appellant shall serve and file his or her brief within thirty (30) days from the date of this notice pursuant to Rule 8018(a) of the Bankruptcy Act and Rules. The Appellee shall serve and file his or her brief within thirty (30) days after the service and filing of the Appellant's brief. The Appellant may serve and file a Reply Brief within fourteen (14) days after the service and filing of the Appellee's Brief. Appellant Brief due by 1/13/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (jbry, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATED RECORD(BANKRUPTCY) by Bankruptcy Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 BK#: 13-04227-jw (Doc.#s: 1,35,38,44,45,48,53,64,66), #2 BK#:13-04227-jw (Claim #10), #3 Record on Appeal from Dabney v. Bank of America, N.A., 2:17-cv-03151-RMG (See Entry 57), #4 ADV.#: 17-80037-jw (Part A) (Doc.#'s: 57,92,97,99,100,120,122,125-127,134,136-146), #5 ADV.#: 17-80037-jw (Part B) (Doc.#'s: 147-149,153,154,158,159,163,166,168,169))(sphipps-USBK, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 13-04227-JW., filed by Kathryn Harrelle Dabney, Frank Scott Dabney. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court.)(vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dabney et al v. Bank of America NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bankruptcy Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Brian Montgomery Barnwell
Represented By: Caroline Dolores Gimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Damon C Wlodarczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Brian A Calub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Damon C Wlodarczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Frank Scott Dabney
Represented By: Robert Bratton Varnado
Represented By: Jason Scott Luck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kathryn Harrelle Dabney
Represented By: Robert Bratton Varnado
Represented By: Jason Scott Luck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?