Muldrow v. South Carolina Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Herman Muldrow
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2019cv03498
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
2 Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Response filed by South Carolina Department of Corrections. (Newton, Lillian Marshall)
February 6, 2020 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Herman Muldrow.(Albrecht, Samantha)
February 6, 2020 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Department of Corrections.(Newton, Lillian Marshall)
February 6, 2020 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by South Carolina Department of Corrections.(Newton, Lillian Marshall)
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by South Carolina Department of Corrections.(Newton, Lillian Marshall)
February 3, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Response filed by Herman Muldrow.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/10/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-EEOC Intake Questionnaire, #2 Exhibit 2-Ltr from EEOC dated 7-02-19)(Albrecht, Samantha)
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay re #6 Scheduling Order,,, by South Carolina Department of Corrections. Response to Motion due by 2/14/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Hodges, Robert)
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by South Carolina Department of Corrections. Response to Motion due by 2/7/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A-Charge of Discrimination, #3 Exhibit B-EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Hodges, Robert)
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kaymani D. West. Magistrate Judge Thomas E. Rogers, III no longer assigned to the case. (bshr, )
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/23/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/6/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 2/6/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/3/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/2/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/4/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/2/2020, Discovery due by 8/20/2020, Motions due by 9/4/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 10/2/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 11/3/2020, ADR Statement due by 9/4/2020, Mediation Due by 10/2/2020. Motions in limine must be filed at least one week prior to date of trial.Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 01/03/2020. (dsto, )
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Herman Muldrow.(Albrecht, Samantha)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by South Carolina Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B-EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights)(Hodges, Robert)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Department of Corrections.(dsto, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clarendon County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-14-582. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8832461), filed by South Carolina Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(dsto, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muldrow v. South Carolina Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Muldrow
Represented By: Samantha Elenor Albrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections
Represented By: Lillian Marshall Coleman Newton
Represented By: Robert Hayne Hodges, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?