Groscost et al v. Valmet Inc et al
Plaintiff: Joshua J Groscost and Kimberly R Groscost
Defendant: Valmet Inc, John Doe #5, Andritz Inc, John Doe #3 and John Doe #2
Case Number: 2:2019cv03510
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 18 MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 8/3/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 2/7/2020. (vdru, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 17 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/28/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 3/13/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 3/13/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/3/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/4/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/3/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/3/2020, Discovery due by 8/3/2020, Motions due by 9/2/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 12/1/2020, Mediation Due by 8/3/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 2/7/2020. (vdru, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 15 Andritz, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Andritz Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Nichols, William)
January 8, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER to Case Number 2:19-cv-3510-BHH. Please use the new case number on all future filings. (vdru, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks. Judge Honorable Richard M Gergel no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Berkeley County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acknowledgement of State Court Clerk of Court of Removal)(Nichols, William)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand Response filed by Andritz Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/10/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Nichols, William)
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by Valmet Inc. (Highfield, Duke)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Valmet Inc.(Highfield, Duke)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint Third Amended by Valmet Inc.(Highfield, Duke)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joshua J Groscost re #4 MOTION to Remand (Ellis, Michael) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/27/2019) (vdru, ). Modified to replace with correct document provided by the filer on 12/27/2019 (vdru, ).
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andritz Inc re #1 Notice of Removal to Valmet, Inc. (Nichols, William)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by Joshua J Groscost, Kimberly R Groscost. Response to Motion due by 1/3/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Ellis, Michael)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Andritz Inc.(sshe, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Berkeley County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-08-02379. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8834141), filed by Andritz Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Groscost et al v. Valmet Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valmet Inc
Represented By: William O Sweeny, IV
Represented By: Brandt Robert Horton
Represented By: Duke Raleigh Highfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andritz Inc
Represented By: Daniel Bowman White
Represented By: William Ryan Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua J Groscost
Represented By: Michael Holland Ellis, Jr
Represented By: O Grady Query
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly R Groscost
Represented By: Michael Holland Ellis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?