Oppenheimer v. Scarafile et al
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Defendant: Michael C Scarafile, Patricia R Scarafile, O'Shaughnessy Real Estate Inc and Sheila Glover Romanosky
Case Number: 2:2019cv03590
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE by David Oppenheimer. O'Shaughnessy Real Estate Inc waiver executed on 12/31/2019, answer due 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver O'Shaughnessy Real Estate d/b/a Carolina One)(Allen, Samuel)
February 13, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE by David Oppenheimer. Sheila Glover Romanosky waiver executed on 12/31/2019, answer due 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver Sheila Glover Romanosky)(Allen, Samuel)
February 13, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE by David Oppenheimer. Patricia R Scarafile waiver executed on 12/31/2019, answer due 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver Patricia R. Scarafile)(Allen, Samuel)
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE by David Oppenheimer. Michael C Scarafile waiver executed on 12/31/2019, answer due 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver Michael R. Scarafile)(Allen, Samuel)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #5 Report on the Filing or Determination of Copyright to Copyright office (508filings@loc.gov). (vdru, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (vdru, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service (Request to Withhold Issuance of Summons) sent to All Defendants on 12/30/2019 by David Oppenheimer. (vdru, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by David Oppenheimer.(vdru, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8851980.), filed by David Oppenheimer. Service due by 3/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Works, #2 Exhibit 2: Cr and Deposit, #3 Exhibit 3: Defendants' Listed Property, #4 Exhibit 4: Defendants' Infringing URL'S, #5 Exhibit 5: Cease and Desist Letter, #6 Exhibit 6: Removal of Metadata)(vdru, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2020: #7 Exhibit 7: Removal of Metadate (part 2)) (vdru, ). Modified to add exhibit as provided by the filer on 1/6/2020 (vdru, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oppenheimer v. Scarafile et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Represented By: Samuel K Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C Scarafile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia R Scarafile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Shaughnessy Real Estate Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Glover Romanosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?