Government of Guam v. The 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Government Of Guam
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, The 3M Company, National Foam Inc, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Co., Tyco Fire Products LP, The Chemours Company and Chemguard Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv03602
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 15 CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Please be advised that all counsel are directed to choose the event Certificate of Service for any proofs of service (returns) to be filed. Do not choose any other event (Acceptance of Service Complaint Served, Summons Returned Executed-Complaint Served(or as to USA-Complaint Served)(or Unexecuted), Waiver of Service, etc.). ONLY choose the event Certificate of Service for any returns to be filed. Prepare a cover page or notice of filing (main document) including the member case number, case caption, a brief statement as to what is being filed, and the attorney filing user's s/attorney typed name or digital signature, and attach the proof of service document. File the Certificate of Service event in the applicable member case only. Please call the Clerk's office with any questions or concerns. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 14 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 8 Reason: Entry filed incorrectly; clerk refiled correctly in management case and spread to applicable member case Corrected Filing Document Number #13 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 1/7/2020 (sshe, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Lana M Rowenko on behalf of Government Of Guam (Rowenko, Lana) Refiled correctly in management case and spread to applicable member case(s), per Judge's filing instructions. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-03602-RMG(sshe, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 10 Reason: Attorney filing user refiled correctly in management case and spread to applicable member case Corrected Filing Document Number #11 Filing date is that of original filing: 1/7/2020 (sshe, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David M Reap on behalf of Government Of Guam Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-03602-RMG(Reap, David)
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Fabio CH Dworschak on behalf of Government Of Guam Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-03602-RMG(Dworschak, Fabio)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William J Jackson on behalf of Government Of Guam Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-03602-RMG(Jackson, William)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John DS Gilmour on behalf of Government Of Guam Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-03602-RMG(Gilmour, John)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Guam, 1:19-cv-00144, Government of Guam v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:19-cv-3602-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 8 (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B, 3.C) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. Please see also NOTICE(s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 1/10/2020 9:00 AM, in Charleston Courtroom #1), J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Guam; Case Number 1:19-cv-00144. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Conditional Transfer Order to the U.S. District Court for the District of South Carolina for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Issued on 11/15/2019. (vtk) [Transferred from Guam on 1/2/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge. (vtk) [Transferred from Guam on 1/2/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing fee paid: $400.00, receipt number GUX015885 re #1 Notice of Removal. (vtk) [Transferred from Guam on 1/2/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal filed by The 3M Company from Superior Court of Guam, case number CV1080-19. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PaymentDue), filed by The 3M Company. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 12/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Coversheet)(Civille (non-CJA), G.) [Transferred from Guam on 1/2/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government of Guam v. The 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 3M Company
Represented By: G. Patrick Civille (non-CJA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Of Guam
Represented By: Joseph A Perez
Represented By: Janice M. Camacho
Represented By: John DS Gilmour
Represented By: William J Jackson
Represented By: Fabio CH Dworschak
Represented By: Lana M Rowenko
Represented By: David M Reap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?