Bartlette et al v. South Carolina Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Garcia Wilson and Brandon Bartlette
Defendant: Mr. Willie Eagleton and South Carolina Department of Corrections
Petitioner: Thomas Roth
Case Number: 2:2019mc00310
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 33 STATUS REPORT by Sergeant Cotton, Willie Eagelton, Cory Lucas, Sergeant Sims, Donnie Stonebreaker, Sergeant Williamson, Correctional Officer Dennis, Correctional Officer Kelly, Joseph McFadden, Correctional Officer McKie, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Correctional Officer Dennis, Correctional Officer Kelly, Joseph McFadden, Correctional Officer McKie, Willie Eagleton. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00050-RMG-MGB, 2:17-cv-03031-RMG-MGB, 2:19-cv-02245-RMG-MGB, 2:19-mc-00310-RMG-MGB(Holler, David)
September 23, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Protective Order by Sergeant Cotton, Willie Eagelton, Cory Lucas, Sergeant Sims, Donnie Stonebreaker, Sergeant Williamson, Correctional Officer Dennis, Correctional Officer Kelly, Joseph McFadden, Correctional Officer McKie, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Correctional Officer Dennis, Correctional Officer Kelly, Joseph McFadden, Correctional Officer McKie, Willie Eagleton. Response to Motion due by 10/7/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)No proposed order.Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00050-RMG-MGB, 2:17-cv-03031-RMG-MGB, 2:19-cv-02245-RMG-MGB, 2:19-mc-00310-RMG-MGBMotions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Holler, David)
September 18, 2019 Filing 30 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/18/2019 to discuss the parties' discovery disputes as to certain documents related to Thomas Roth's subpoena and the Roth Report. The parties informed the Court that Mr. Roth has mailed SCDC a flash drive containing his communications with SCDC. The Court directed defense counsel for SCDC to inform the Court as soon as SCDC receives the flash drive. In addition, after defense counsel reviews the flash drive, he is to send a copy of the flash drive to the Court by express overnight delivery or by hand delivery. The parties were advised that any future requests for extension of the discovery deadlines must be directed to the District Judge. Court Reporter: Tana Hess. Associated Cases: 2:19-mc-00310-RMG-MGB, 1:18-cv-00050-RMG-MGB, 2:17-cv-03031-RMG-MGB(ssam, ) Modified to edit text on 9/18/2019 (ssam, ).
September 17, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Hearing: Notice of Telephonic Hearing set for 9/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker, to discuss the parties' discovery disputes as to certain documents requested by Plaintiffs from SCDC that are associated with Thomas Roth's subpoena and/or concern Mr. Roth. Dial-in instructions will be emailed to counsel. Associated Cases: 2:19-mc-00310-RMG-MGB, 1:18-cv-00050-RMG-MGB, 2:17-cv-03031-RMG-MGB(hada, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re (10 in 2:19-mc-00310-RMG-MGB) MOTION to Quash Response filed by Correctional Officer Dennis, Correctional Officer Kelly, Joseph McFadden, Correctional Officer McKie, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Sergeant Cotton, Willie Eagelton, Sergeant Sims, Donnie Stonebreaker, Sergeant Williamson, Correctional Officer Dennis, Correctional Officer Kelly, Joseph McFadden, Correctional Officer McKie, Willie Eagleton.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/23/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Associated Cases: 2:19-mc-00310-RMG-MGB et al.(Holler, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2019 10:00 AM Associated Cases: 2:19-mc-00310-RMG-MGB, 1:18-cv-00050-RMG-MGB, 2:17-cv-03031-RMG-MGB(hada, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 25 TEXT ORDER. Based on Movant Thomas Roths Withdrawal of his Motion to Quash (Dkt. No. 24), the Motion to Quash (Dkt. No. 10) is no longer pending. The Court therefore cancels the hearing noticed for September 18, 2019. In addition, the Court vacates the September 10, 2019 Text Order (Dkt. No. 16), as Plaintiffs no longer need to file a response to the Motion. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 9/16/19. (akob, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 24 Withdrawal of Motions: (10 in 2:19-mc-00310-RMG-MGB) MOTION to Quash filed by Thomas Roth.. Associated Cases: 2:19-mc-00310-RMG-MGB, 1:18-cv-00050-RMG-MGB(Roth, Robert)
September 13, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Drew Hamilton Butler on behalf of South Carolina Department of Corrections (Butler, Drew)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #20 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 09/13/2019.(hada, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay re (152 in 1:18-cv-00050-RMG-MGB) Notice of Hearing on Motion,, by Thomas Roth. Response to Motion due by 9/26/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:19-mc-00310-RMG-MGB, 1:18-cv-00050-RMG-MGBMotions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Roth, Robert)
September 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion (10 in 2:19-mc-00310-RMG-MGB) MOTION to Quash : Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2019 10:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #6, U. S. Court House, 85 Broad St, Charleston before Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker. Mr. Thomas Roth and his counsel may attend the hearing by telephone. Call-in instructions for the hearing are forthcoming. Associated Cases: 2:19-mc-00310-RMG-MGB, 1:18-cv-00050-RMG-MGB, 2:17-cv-03031-RMG-MGB(hada, ) Modified docket text per Chamber's request on 9/12/2019 (hada, ).
September 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David Cornwell Holler on behalf of Willie Eagleton, South Carolina Department of Corrections (Holler, David)
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to respond to the #10 Motion to Quash by Monday, September 16, 2019. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 9/10/19. (akob, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James Edward Bell, III on behalf of Brandon Bartlette (Bell, James)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Michael Galvin on behalf of Garcia Wilson (Galvin, Gregory)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-05506. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Quash by Thomas Roth. Response to Motion due by 9/20/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas Roth)No proposed order. Clerk filed as of date of inter-district transfer(sshe, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 TRANSFERRED to the District of South Carolina, the electronic record. (ek, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/9/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/5/2019. Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Mr. Roths Motion to Quash to the District of South Carolina under Rule 45(f) #1 is granted. The clerks office is directed to transfer case to the District of South Carolina forthwith. See Order for further details. Mailed notice(lk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/9/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiffs Brandon Bartlette, Garcia Wilson to transfer case or, in the alternative, motion to compel and opposition to motion to quash subpoenas to non-party witness, Thomas Roth (Rogers, Larry) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/9/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Brandon Bartlette, Garcia Wilson by Larry R. Rogers, Jr (Rogers, Larry) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/9/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial Status hearing set for 9/26/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/9/2019.]
August 14, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (sxb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/9/2019.]
August 14, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ecw, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/9/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Thomas Roth by Robert Alan Roth (Roth, Robert) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/9/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Roth, Robert) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/9/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE by Thomas Roth Motion to Quash Subpoenas to Non-Party Thomas Roth Or, In the Alternative, For Modification and Protective Order Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 0752-16138712. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Thomas Roth)(Roth, Robert) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartlette et al v. South Carolina Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Roth
Represented By: Robert Alan Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Willie Eagleton
Represented By: David Cornwell Holler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections
Represented By: David Cornwell Holler
Represented By: Drew Hamilton Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garcia Wilson
Represented By: Larry R. Rogers, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory Michael Galvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Bartlette
Represented By: Larry R. Rogers, Jr.
Represented By: James Edward Bell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?