State of New York v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: State of New York
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, National Foam Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Amerex Corporation, Fire Service Plus, Inc., 3M Company and Chemguard Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00048
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Service with Fire Service Plus, Inc. by State of New York. (McGrath, Brendan)
February 7, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Please be advised that all counsel are directed to choose the event Certificate of Service for any proofs of service (returns) to be filed. Do not choose any other event (Acceptance of Service Complaint Served, Summons Returned Executed-Complaint Served(or as to USA-Complaint Served)(or Unexecuted), Waiver of Service, etc.). ONLY choose the event Certificate of Service for any returns to be filed. Prepare a cover page or notice of filing (main document) including the member case number, case caption, a brief statement as to what is being filed, and the attorney filing user's s/attorney typed name or digital signature, and attach the proof of service document. File the Certificate of Service event in the applicable member case only. Please call the Clerk's office with any questions or concerns. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern New York, 1:19-cv-01541, State of New York v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:20-cv-00048-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 8 (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B, 3.C) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. Please see also NOTICE(s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 1/10/2020 9:00 AM, in Charleston Courtroom #1), J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-01541. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #21. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of South Carolina for inclusion into MDL-2873 Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Richard M. Gergel, U.S. District Judge. (plp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE as to Attorney Jonathan I. Handler re #4 Notice of Admission Requirement. Attorney Handler does not intend to remain as counsel of record. Attorney John W. Cerreta filed a #7 Notice of Appearance on behalf of defendant Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. {With copy of Notice of Admission Requirement and envelope attached}. (kmp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Cerreta on behalf of Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. (Cerreta, John) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Letter Request from Nicole G. McDonough for Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP requesting Adjourment of Deadlines Pending Decision on JPML Transfer. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 12/23/2019. (tab)[Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 Letter Request Letter Motion from Nicole G. McDonough for Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP requesting Adjourment of Deadlines Pending Decision on JPML Transfer submitted to Judge Glenn T. Suddaby . (McDonough, Nicole) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.]
December 13, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk notes that Assistant Attorney Generals Brendan S. McGrath, Lisa M. Burianek, and Matthew J. Sinkman addresses listed on CM/ECF differ than what is listed on the Certificate of Service from the Notice of Removal. If CM/ECF needs to be updated the attorneys are directed to do so. (kmp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.]
December 13, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Tyco Fire Products, LP answer due 12/19/2019 and Chemguard, Inc. answer due 12/19/2019. (kmp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Defendants; Attorney Michael L. Carpenter, Email address is mcarpenter@gastonlegal.com. Phone number is 706-865-4400 and Attorney Jonathan I. Handler, Email address is jhandler@daypitney.com. Phone number is 617-345-4600. Admissions due by 12/27/2019. Copies served upon attorneys by regular mail on 12/13/19. (Attachments: #1 Admission Requirement as to Party Defendant; Attorney Jonathan I. Handler)(kmp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In Person Rule 16 Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/9/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kmp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Chemguard, Inc. and Tyco Fire Products, LP. (kmp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Albany County Supreme Court, case number 907664-19 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4971706) filed by Chemguard, Inc. and Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 1/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of New York v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Represented By: Keith Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Joseph G Petrosinelli
Represented By: Nicole Gerritsen Mcdonough
Represented By: Thomas John Herten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Represented By: John W Cerreta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Service Plus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Calica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Represented By: Joseph G Petrosinelli
Represented By: Nicole Gerritsen Mcdonough
Represented By: Thomas John Herten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Represented By: Brendan S McGrath
Represented By: Philip M Bein
Represented By: Matthew J. Sinkman
Represented By: Lisa M. Burianek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?