Holmes et al v. Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd, P.A.
Appellant: C. Holmes, Cynthia Collie Holmes and Cynthia Holmes
Appellee: Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd, P.A.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00234
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Referring Judge: Bristow Marchant
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Disqualify Magistrate Judge by C. Holmes. Response to Motion due by 3/23/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(cpeg, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to C. Holmes P.O. Box 187 Sullivans Island, SC 29482-0187 (hada, )
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER The Court orders the parties to file briefs. Appellant shall serve and file his brief within thirty (30) days from the date this order is entered. Appellee shall serve and file its brief within thirty (30) days after the service of Appellant's brief. Appellant shall serve and file any rely brief within fourteen (14) days after the service of the Appellee's brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 02/25/2020. (hada, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATED RECORD(BANKRUPTCY) by Bankruptcy Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet and Designated Record on Appeal)(kdouglass-USBK, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-01644-DD., filed by C. Holmes. (Attachments: #1 transmittal of notice of appeal) (egra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes et al v. Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: C. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Cynthia Collie Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Cynthia Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd, P.A.
Represented By: Mary McFarland Caskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?