California-American Water Company v. USA
Plaintiff: California-American Water Company
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv00834
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Charleston Office
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Filing 11 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: California Eastern, 2:20-cv-00144, California-American Water Company v. USA, as DSC case 2:20-cv-834-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 8 (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B, 3.C) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. Please see also NOTICE(s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 4/3/2020 9:00 AM, in Charleston Courtroom #1), J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00144. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to District of South Carolina. Electronic transfer sent. Case Closed. (Donati, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/25/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/6/2020. Added attorney J. Nixon Daniel for California-American Water Company.(Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/25/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America by California-American Water Company.(Cooke, David) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/25/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by California-American Water Company for attorney J. Nixon Daniel III to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8717972) (Cooke, David)[Transferred from California Eastern on 2/25/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by California-American Water Company for attorney T. Roe Frazer II to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8714415) (Cooke, David)[Transferred from California Eastern on 2/25/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff California-American Water Company. (Cooke, David) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/25/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2020, at 02:30 PM, in Courtroom 3 (KJM), before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (York, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/25/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States of America* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *David Duval Cooke* *Allen Matkins Leck Gamble & Mallory LLP* *Three Embarcadero Center, 12th Floor* *San Francisco, CA 94111-4074*. (York, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/25/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America by California-American Water Company. Attorney Cooke, David Duval added. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0972-8680480) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cooke, David) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/25/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California-American Water Company v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California-American Water Company
Represented By: David Duval Cooke
Represented By: J Nixon Daniel, III
Represented By: Kamran Javandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?