Gender and Sexuality Alliance et al v. Spearman
Plaintiff: South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc, Campaign for Southern Equality and Gender and Sexuality Alliance
Defendant: Molly Spearman
Case Number: 2:2020cv00847
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Filing 20 CONSENT DECREE AND JUDGMENT granting #18 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/11/2020.(jbry, ) (Main Document 20 replaced on 3/11/2020) (jbry, ). Modified on 3/11/2020 to replace with corrected order(jbry, ).
March 10, 2020 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Campaign for Southern Equality, Gender and Sexuality Alliance, South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/24/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit Consent Decree)No proposed order.(Hall, Kevin)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Motion by Peter C. Renn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/5/2020.(jbry, )
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion by Puneet Cheema to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/5/2020.(jbry, )
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #9 Motion by Tara L. Borelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/5/2020.(jbry, )
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Motion by Meghann Kay Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/5/2020.(jbry, )
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Motion by Clifford J. Rosky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/5/2020.(jbry, )
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Motion by Julie H. Wilensky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/5/2020.(jbry, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter C. Renn ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8983666) by Campaign for Southern Equality, Gender and Sexuality Alliance, South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/18/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit For Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)No proposed order.(Hall, Kevin)
March 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Puneet Cheema ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8983584) by Campaign for Southern Equality, Gender and Sexuality Alliance, South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/18/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit For Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)No proposed order.(Hall, Kevin)
March 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tara L. Borelli ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8983561) by Campaign for Southern Equality, Gender and Sexuality Alliance, South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/18/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit For Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)No proposed order.(Hall, Kevin)
March 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Meghann Kay Burke ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8983533) by Campaign for Southern Equality, Gender and Sexuality Alliance, South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/18/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit For Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)No proposed order.(Hall, Kevin)
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Clifford J. Rosky ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8983505) by Campaign for Southern Equality, Gender and Sexuality Alliance, South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/18/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit For Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)No proposed order.(Hall, Kevin)
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julie H. Wilensky ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8983465) by Campaign for Southern Equality, Gender and Sexuality Alliance, South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/18/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit For Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)No proposed order.(Hall, Kevin)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gender and Sexuality Alliance, Campaign for Southern Equality, South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc. Molly Spearman served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (Hall, Kevin) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/27/2020) (jbry, ). Modified on 2/27/2020 to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user (jbry, ).
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Molly Spearman. (jbry, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Campaign for Southern Equality, Gender and Sexuality Alliance, South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc.(jbry, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Molly Spearman ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8968398.), filed by Gender and Sexuality Alliance, Campaign for Southern Equality, South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc. Service due by 5/26/2020(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gender and Sexuality Alliance et al v. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc
Represented By: Kevin A Hall
Represented By: Peter C Renn
Represented By: Clifford J Rosky
Represented By: Julie H Wilensky
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: Puneet Cheema
Represented By: Meghann Kay Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Campaign for Southern Equality
Represented By: Kevin A Hall
Represented By: Peter C Renn
Represented By: Clifford J Rosky
Represented By: Julie H Wilensky
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: Puneet Cheema
Represented By: Meghann Kay Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gender and Sexuality Alliance
Represented By: Kevin A Hall
Represented By: Peter C Renn
Represented By: Clifford J Rosky
Represented By: Julie H Wilensky
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: Puneet Cheema
Represented By: Meghann Kay Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly Spearman
Represented By: Cathy Lynne Hazelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?