Gibbs v. Speedway LLC et al
Plaintiff: Trenita Gibbs
Defendant: John Doe and Speedway LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00861
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 First Rule 26 Statement of Facts by Trenita Gibbs.(Garan, Kassandra)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Trenita Gibbs.(Garan, Kassandra)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 3/24/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/10/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 4/10/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/11/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/12/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/13/2020, Discovery due by 11/6/2020, Motions in Limine due at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 11/20/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 1/1/2021, ADR Statement due by 12/1/2020, Mediation Due by 12/31/2020, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/2/2020. (jbry, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Speedway LLC.(Crites, J)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Speedway LLC.(jbry, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Berkeley County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-08-00256. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8969935), filed by Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Statements of Good Standing)(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibbs v. Speedway LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trenita Gibbs
Represented By: Kassandra Jo Garan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: J Bennett Crites, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?