Carver Stevedoring Services Inc v. Navios Christine B et al
Plaintiff: Carver Stevedoring Services Inc
Defendant: Coasters Ventures Ltd, Navios Christine B, Navios Maritime Partners LP, Imba Maritime S.A. and Navios Shipmanagement, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Carver Maritime LLC
Intervenor Plaintiff: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01344
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 36 TEXT ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #30 Intervenor Complaint. Defendants' answers due 8/31/2020. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 6/3/2020.(vdru, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 35 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #30 Intervenor Complaint by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 6/17/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Jett, Zachary)
June 1, 2020 Filing 34 Summons for Intervenor Complaint Issued as to Navios Shipmanagement Inc. (vdru, )
June 1, 2020 Filing 33 Summons for Intervenor Complaint Issued as to Coasters Ventures Ltd. (vdru, ) (Main Document 33 replaced on 6/1/2020) (vdru, ). Modified to replace with corrected document on 6/1/2020 (vdru, ).
June 1, 2020 Filing 32 Summons to Intervenor Complaint Issued as to Navios Christine B. (vdru, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 31 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Hartford Fire Insurance Company.(Jett, Zachary)
May 29, 2020 Filing 30 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Amended Complaint) (Jett, Zachary)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Intervene. It is ordered that Hartford Fire Insurance Companys Motion to Intervene is hereby granted. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 5/29/2020.(vdru, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER to Case Number 2:20-cv-1344-BHH per the reassignment of this case to Judge Bruce Howe Hendricks. Please use the new case number on all future filings. (vdru, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 26 Case Reassigned to Judge Bruce Howe Hendricks. Judge David C Norton no longer assigned to the case. (suro)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #19 Amended Complaint Coasters Ventures Ltd answer due 8/19/2020; Navios Christine B answer due 8/19/2020; Navios Shipmanagement, Inc. answer due 8/19/2020. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 5/26/2020.(jbry, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 24 Consent MOTION to Intervene by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 6/9/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Intervening Complaint)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Jett, Zachary)
May 21, 2020 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Carver Stevedoring Services Inc. Response to Motion due by 6/4/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Cooper, John)
May 21, 2020 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Navios Shipmanagement, Inc. (jbry, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Coasters Ventures Ltd, Navios Christine B, Navios Shipmanagement, Inc., filed by Carver Stevedoring Services Inc. Service due by 8/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Summons Navios Shipmanagement, Inc.) (Cooper, John)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER finding as moot #2 Motion to Seal Case Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 4/16/2020.(jbry, )
April 13, 2020 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #16 Order For Release of Vessel to all attorneys of record (jbry, )
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR RELEASE OF VESSEL Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 4/13/2020. (jbry, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED 10 Order on Ex Parte Motion, #11 Order for Warrant for Arrest of Property, #13 Writ Issued, #12 Order, #9 Order on Motion to Appoint Custodian, #14 Warrant In Rem Issued to all attorneys of record (jbry, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 14 WARRANT FOR ARREST OF VESSEL IN ACTION IN REM ISSUED (jbry, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 13 WRIT OF ATTACHMENT issued (jbry, )
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER APPOINTING JOHN R. GAMBLE, JR. TO SERVE PROCESS Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 4/10/2020. (jbry, )
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AUTHORIZING ISSUANCE OF WARRANT IN ACTION IN REM Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 4/10/2020. (jbry, )
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appoint Custodian Carver Maritime LLC appointed Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 4/10/2020.(jbry, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #2 MOTION to Seal Case, #4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #5 Summons Issued, #3 MOTION to Appoint Custodian, #1 Complaint, to Albert Bilbrey,Jr. agbilbrey@jhcooper.com, John Hughes Cooper shiplaw@jhcooper.com, and John Townsend Cooper jtc@jhcooper.com (jbry, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbry, ) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/8/2020) (jbry, ). Modified on 4/8/2020 to correct caption (jbry, ). (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/8/2020) (jbry, ).
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Carver Stevedoring Services Inc.(jbry, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Custodian by Carver Stevedoring Services Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/22/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Substitute Custodian, #2 Proposed Order appointing substitute)(jbry, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Case by Carver Stevedoring Services Inc. Response to Motion due by 4/22/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to File Under Seal)(jbry, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9041979.), filed by Carver Stevedoring Services Inc. Service due by 7/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Attorney Affidavit for Rule B Attachment, #2 Proposed Order Appointing John R. Gamble, Jr. to Serve Process, #3 Proposed Order Authorizing Issuance of Warrant in Rem, #4 Supporting Documents Warrant for Arrest of Vessel, #5 Proposed Order Authorizing Issuance of Writ of Attachment, #6 Supporting Documents Writ of Attachment)(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carver Stevedoring Services Inc v. Navios Christine B et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Carver Maritime LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carver Stevedoring Services Inc
Represented By: John Townsend Cooper
Represented By: Albert Glen Bilbrey, Jr.
Represented By: John Hughes Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coasters Ventures Ltd
Represented By: Ryan Daniel Gilsenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navios Christine B
Represented By: Ryan Daniel Gilsenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navios Maritime Partners LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imba Maritime S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navios Shipmanagement, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Daniel Gilsenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Zachary M Jett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?