American Builders Insurance Company v. Archer Development Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: American Builders Insurance Company
Defendant: Archer Development Group LLC, William White, Annette P Sherman, Jan R Gunn, John Michels, Chris Taylor, Tara White, Matthew Horton, Thomas E Young, Jr, Enoch G Sherman, Robert S Foster, Sr, Darci Buchanan, Beverly Carroll, Tal Wilkins, Kirk A Gunn, Michelle T Barford, Beth Stenger, Archer Construction LLC, Walter Stenger, Lydia Schafer, Ellen Parker, Mark A Barford, Leah Wilkins, Nancy T Roughgarden, Karen Miller, Karl Buchanan, Holly Blanchard, Connie Michels, Leo Brueggeman, Catherine T Young, Thomas Cordeiro, Archer Construction, C Hampton Atkins, Jane Taylor, Gayle C Foster, Patrick Schafer and Matthew V Roughgarden
Case Number: 2:2020cv01694
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/22/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/10/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 8/10/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/8/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/13/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/16/2020, Discovery due by 3/5/2021, Motions in Limine due at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 3/19/2021, Bench Trial Deadline 5/2/2021, ADR Statement due by 3/31/2021, Mediation Due by 4/30/2021, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/4/2020. (jbry, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Interrogatories from Owner Defendants by C Hampton Atkins, Mark A Barford, Michelle T Barford, Holly Blanchard, Leo Brueggeman, Darci Buchanan, Karl Buchanan, Beverly Carroll, Thomas Cordeiro, Gayle C Foster, Robert S Foster, Sr, Jan R Gunn, Kirk A Gunn, Matthew Horton, Connie Michels, John Michels, Karen Miller, Ellen Parker, Matthew V Roughgarden, Nancy T Roughgarden, Lydia Schafer, Patrick Schafer, Annette P Sherman, Enoch G Sherman, Beth Stenger, Walter Stenger, Chris Taylor, Jane Taylor, Tara White, William White, Leah Wilkins, Tal Wilkins, Catherine T Young, Thomas E Young, Jr.(Lyles, Robert)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint Declaratory Judgment Action Complaint by C Hampton Atkins, Mark A Barford, Michelle T Barford, Holly Blanchard, Leo Brueggeman, Darci Buchanan, Karl Buchanan, Beverly Carroll, Thomas Cordeiro, Gayle C Foster, Robert S Foster, Sr, Jan R Gunn, Kirk A Gunn, Matthew Horton, Connie Michels, John Michels, Karen Miller, Ellen Parker, Matthew V Roughgarden, Nancy T Roughgarden, Lydia Schafer, Patrick Schafer, Annette P Sherman, Enoch G Sherman, Beth Stenger, Walter Stenger, Chris Taylor, Jane Taylor, Tara White, William White, Leah Wilkins, Tal Wilkins, Catherine T Young, Thomas E Young, Jr.(Lyles, Robert)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbry, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American Builders Insurance Company.(jbry, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9078417.), filed by American Builders Insurance Company. Service due by 7/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint in Underlying State Court Action, #2 Exhibit B - AIC First Policy, #3 Exhibit C - AIC Second Policy, #4 Exhibit D - AIC Reservation of Rights Letter)(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Builders Insurance Company v. Archer Development Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archer Development Group LLC
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William White
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette P Sherman
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan R Gunn
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Michels
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Taylor
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara White
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Horton
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E Young, Jr
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enoch G Sherman
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S Foster, Sr
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darci Buchanan
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Carroll
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tal Wilkins
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk A Gunn
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle T Barford
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Stenger
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archer Construction LLC
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Stenger
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lydia Schafer
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Parker
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A Barford
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leah Wilkins
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy T Roughgarden
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Miller
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Buchanan
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Blanchard
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Michels
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Brueggeman
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine T Young
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Cordeiro
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archer Construction
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Hampton Atkins
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Taylor
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayle C Foster
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Schafer
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew V Roughgarden
Represented By: Robert T Lyles, Jr
Represented By: Andrew J Toney
Represented By: Robert L Wylie, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Builders Insurance Company
Represented By: Olesya Vaskevich Bracey
Represented By: Robert W Whelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?