Lincoln v. G2 Secure Staff LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lavern Lincoln
Defendant: G2 Secure Staff LLC and Charleston County Aviation Authority
Case Number: 2:2020cv01954
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Molly H Cherry
Referring Judge: Bristow Marchant
2 Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry. Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant no longer assigned to the case. (swil, )
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Response due by 09/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 06/25/2020.(cpeg, )
June 24, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time by G2 Secure Staff LLC. Response to Motion due by 7/8/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Evert, Jill)
June 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill April Evert on behalf of G2 Secure Staff LLC (Evert, Jill)
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lavern Lincoln re 6 Order on Motion to Stay,, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bojarski, Christopher)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER Plaintiff's motion to stay is granted. This case shall be stayed for ninety (90) days or until the Plaintiff's filing of her right-to-sue letter on the docket, whichever occurs first. In order for the Court to have notice of the issuance of her right-to-sue letter, Plaintiff is directed to file a copy on the docket in this case within seven (7) days of its receipt. The Plaintiff is further directed to mail a copy of the Complaint in this case along with a copy of this Order to both Defendants in this case and file a copy of that notice on the docket. IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 05/27/2020.(hada, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay by Lavern Lincoln. Response to Motion due by 6/9/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Bojarski, Christopher)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Charleston County Aviation Authority, G2 Secure Staff LLC. Service due by 8/19/2020 (cpeg, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lavern Lincoln.(cpeg, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charleston County Aviation Authority, G2 Secure Staff LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9113643.), filed by Lavern Lincoln. Service due by 8/19/2020(cpeg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lincoln v. G2 Secure Staff LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G2 Secure Staff LLC
Represented By: Jill April Evert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charleston County Aviation Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavern Lincoln
Represented By: Christopher Bojarski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?