Legette v. South Carolina Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Richard Legette
Defendant: Associate Warden Rudy Tisdale, Associate Warden Sharpe, South Carolina Department of Corrections and Warden Aaron Joyner
Case Number: 2:2020cv02092
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/2/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/1/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/2/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/2/2021, Discovery due by 4/1/2021, Motions due by 6/1/2021, Mediation Due by 5/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 07/13/2020. (hada, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Warden Aaron Joyner, Associate Warden Sharpe, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Associate Warden Rudy Tisdale.(DeMasters, David)
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Warden Aaron Joyner, Associate Warden Sharpe, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Associate Warden Rudy Tisdale.(DeMasters, David)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Warden Aaron Joyner, Associate Warden Sharpe, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Associate Warden Rudy Tisdale. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeMasters, David)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Warden Aaron Joyner, Associate Warden Sharpe, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Associate Warden Rudy Tisdale.(DeMasters, David)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Richard Legette.(Bell, James)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/30/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/10/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 7/10/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/4/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/3/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/5/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/5/2020, Discovery due by 12/2/2020, Motions due by 2/1/2021, Mediation Due by 1/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 06/09/2020. (hada, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Warden Aaron Joyner, Associate Warden Sharpe, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Associate Warden Rudy Tisdale.(DeMasters, David)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Warden Aaron Joyner, Associate Warden Sharpe, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Associate Warden Rudy Tisdale.(hada, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lee County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020CP3100118. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9128725), filed by South Carolina Department of Corrections, Warden Aaron Joyner, Associate Warden Rudy Tisdale, Associate Warden Sharpe. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Affidavit)(hada, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Legette v. South Carolina Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associate Warden Rudy Tisdale
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Represented By: David Allan DeMasters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associate Warden Sharpe
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Represented By: David Allan DeMasters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Represented By: David Allan DeMasters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Aaron Joyner
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Represented By: David Allan DeMasters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Legette
Represented By: James Edward Bell, III
Represented By: Joshua Michael Wesley Salley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?