Medlyn v. Warden, F.C.I. Bennettsville
Petitioner: Jason Medlyn
Respondent: Warden, F.C.I. Bennettsville
Case Number: 2:2020cv02119
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT by Jason Medlyn to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hada, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jason Medlyn. Response to Motion due by 6/24/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(hada, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jason Medlyn. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(hada, ) Modified docket text to add link to #4 Supplement on 6/21/2020 (hada, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medlyn v. Warden, F.C.I. Bennettsville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Medlyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, F.C.I. Bennettsville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?