Doe v. North Charleston Police Department et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Reginald L Burgess, Eddie Driggers, North Charleston Police Department, Ray Crawford and City of North Charleston
Case Number: 2:2020cv02202
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bristow Marchant
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/27/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 7/27/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/17/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/16/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/31/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/31/2021, Discovery due by 3/1/2021, Motions due by 6/15/2021, Mediation Due by 4/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 07/28/2020. (cpeg, ) Modified to correct docket text on 7/29/2020 (cpeg, ).
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCool, Christopher)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by John Doe.(McCool, Christopher)
July 9, 2020 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry. Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant no longer assigned to the case. (swil, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by John Doe.(McCool, Christopher)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/13/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/27/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 7/27/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/17/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/17/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/16/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/16/2020, Discovery due by 12/16/2020, Motions due by 2/15/2021, Mediation Due by 1/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 06/22/2020. (cpeg, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint by Reginald L Burgess, City of North Charleston, Ray Crawford, Eddie Driggers, North Charleston Police Department.(Smythe, George)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Reginald L Burgess, City of North Charleston, Ray Crawford, Eddie Driggers, North Charleston Police Department.(cpeg, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-10-2069. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9149911), filed by Ray Crawford, North Charleston Police Department, Reginald L Burgess, Eddie Driggers, City of North Charleston. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Certification Rule 11)(cpeg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. North Charleston Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald L Burgess
Represented By: George Buist Smythe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Driggers
Represented By: George Buist Smythe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Charleston Police Department
Represented By: George Buist Smythe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Crawford
Represented By: George Buist Smythe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of North Charleston
Represented By: George Buist Smythe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Christopher J McCool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?