Coraopolis Water and Sewer Authority v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: CORAOPOLIS WATER AND SEWER AUTHORITY
Defendant: Dynax Corporation, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, John Doe Defendants 1-49, The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C., Deepwater Chemicals Inc, National Foam Inc, Arkema Inc, AGC Inc, ChemDesign Products Incorporated, Chubb Fire LTD, Clariant Corporation, Corteva Inc, United Technologies Corporation, 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, The Ansul Company, ELE' CORPORATION, Kidde Fire Fighting Inc, Solvay Specialty Polymers USA LLC, Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard Inc, Dyneon LLC, Nation Ford Chemical Corporation, DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise, Angus International Safety Group LTD, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, The Chemours Company LLC, Daikin Industries Ltd, Chemicals Incorporated, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, Daikin America Inc, Kidde PLC Inc, Dowdupont Inc, BASF Corporation, Archroma Management LLC, JOHNSON CONTROLS FIRE PROTECTION, Narchem Corporation, Angus Fire Armour Corporation, Johnson Controls International plc and Arkema France SA
Case Number: 2:2020cv02384
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION Regarding Daikin America, Inc.'s Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by Daikin America Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-00797-RMG, 2:20-cv-01478-RMG, 2:20-cv-02384-RMG(Grossman, Theodore)
July 29, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore M Grossman on behalf of Daikin America Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-00797-RMG, 2:20-cv-01478-RMG, 2:20-cv-02384-RMG(Grossman, Theodore)
July 29, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebekah E Blake on behalf of Daikin America Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-00797-RMG, 2:20-cv-01478-RMG, 2:20-cv-02384-RMG(Blake, Rebekah)
July 22, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Raymond-Flood on behalf of The Chemours Company LLC, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company, The, Chemours Company, The Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Raymond-Flood, Margaret)
July 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha N Donovan on behalf of The Chemours Company, Chemours Company, The, Chemours Company, The, The Chemours Company LLC, Chemours Company LLC, The, Chemours Company, The Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Donovan, Martha)
July 9, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CORAOPOLIS WATER AND SEWER AUTHORITY as to Defendant Solvay Specialty Polymers USA, LLC only Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-02384-RMG(Sanchez, M)
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corporation.(Holian, Matthew)
June 26, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Summy on behalf of CORAOPOLIS WATER AND SEWER AUTHORITY Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-02384-RMG(Summy, Scott)
June 26, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Burke Pickrel on behalf of CORAOPOLIS WATER AND SEWER AUTHORITY Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-02384-RMG(Burke Pickrel, Carla)
June 26, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary David Sandman on behalf of CORAOPOLIS WATER AND SEWER AUTHORITY Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-02384-RMG(Sandman, Zachary)
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Cary L McDougal on behalf of CORAOPOLIS WATER AND SEWER AUTHORITY Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-02384-RMG(McDougal, Cary)
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by M Cristina Sanchez on behalf of CORAOPOLIS WATER AND SEWER AUTHORITY Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-02384-RMG(Sanchez, M)
June 24, 2020 Filing 9 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Pennsylvania Western, 2:20-cv-00812, Coraopolis Water and Sewer Authority v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:20-cv-2384-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 11, (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B, 3.C, 3.D, 5.A, 5.B, 10.A) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. Please also read NOTICE(s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference will be a Telephone Conference set for 7/10/2020 10:00 AM, before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:20-cv-00812. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement identifying Daikin Holdings America Inc.; Daikin Industries, Ltd. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DAIKIN AMERICA, INC.. (Parsons, Joseph) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/24/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph N. Parsons on behalf of DAIKIN AMERICA, INC.. (Parsons, Joseph) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/24/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from District of South Carolina. (sdp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/24/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (sdp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/24/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/17/2020. (jgb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/24/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying 3M India, Ltd. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by 3M COMPANY. (DiSipio, Basil) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/24/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number 20-5577 with jury demand Copies attached: complaint, motion pro hac vice, affidavit of service (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 5656960), filed by TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP, 3M COMPANY, CHEMGUARD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 certificate of service) (sdp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/24/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coraopolis Water and Sewer Authority v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants 1-49
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChemDesign Products Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Fire LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clariant Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Basil A Disipio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ansul Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELE' CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Fire Fighting Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solvay Specialty Polymers USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Mark A. Aronchick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Represented By: Mark A. Aronchick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dyneon LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nation Ford Chemical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angus International Safety Group LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company LLC
Represented By: Martha N Donovan
Represented By: Margaret Raymond-Flood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daikin Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemicals Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daikin America Inc
Represented By: Joseph N. Parsons
Represented By: Theodore M Grossman
Represented By: Rebekah E Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dowdupont Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Matthew A Holian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON CONTROLS FIRE PROTECTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Narchem Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angus Fire Armour Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls International plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema France SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORAOPOLIS WATER AND SEWER AUTHORITY
Represented By: Vincent A. Tucceri
Represented By: Zachary David Sandman
Represented By: M Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Carla Burke Pickrel
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?