Griffing v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Patricia A Griffing
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Inc, Trane Technologies Public Limited Company, ViacomCBS Inc, Tate Andale LLC, Gardner Denver Holdings Inc, General Electric Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC, Trane Technologies Company LLC, John Crane Inc, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, IMO Industries Inc, Aldrich Pump LLC, Temco Machine Works Inc, Viacom Inc, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Crane Co, Sprirax Sarco Inc, Charleston Rubber & Gasket Co Inc, Honeywell International Inc, FM Corporation, AW Chesterton Company, Tate Temco Inc, Circor Instrumentation Technologies Inc A New York Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of South Carolina doing business as Hoke, Ingersoll-Rand PLC, CBS Corporation and Ingersoll-Rand Industrial US Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv02661
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by William Ansel Collins, Jr on behalf of IMO Industries Inc (Collins, William)
August 31, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Patricia A Griffing as to Defendant ViacomCBS Inc. (Humphrey, Robert)
August 17, 2020 Filing 46 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Circor Instrumentation Technologies Inc.(Kozick, Stephen)
August 17, 2020 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Complaint by Circor Instrumentation Technologies Inc.(Kozick, Stephen)
August 17, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Michael Kozick on behalf of Circor Instrumentation Technologies Inc (Kozick, Stephen)
August 17, 2020 Filing 43 TEXT ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Response to Motion due by 8/31/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 8/17/2020.(vdru, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 42 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Patricia A Griffing. Response to Motion due by 8/28/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Humphrey, Robert)
August 11, 2020 Filing 41 REPLY by John Crane Inc Reply to Order for Information on Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Screen Shot of 7.20.20 Notice of Electronic Filing, #2 Exhibit B: 7.21.20 from USDC Docket #10 error in filing, #3 Exhibit C: USDC Resp JE resp to 2nd Request)(Elliott, James) Modified to add exhibit descriptions as provided by the filer on 8/14/2020 (vdru, ).
August 7, 2020 Filing 40 REPLY by ViacomCBS Inc to #39 Order . (Techman, Jennifer)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal filed by ViacomCBS Inc. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 8/4/2020. (vdru, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 38 TEXT ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Plaintiff is granted an extension of time to respond to Defendant Viacom CBS's Motion to Dismiss. Response to Motion due by 8/17/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 8/3/2020.(vdru, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Patricia A Griffing. Response to Motion due by 8/14/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Humphrey, Robert)
July 31, 2020 Filing 36 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Patricia A Griffing.(Humphrey, Robert)
July 24, 2020 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sprirax Sarco Inc. (Techman, Jennifer)
July 24, 2020 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Techman, Jennifer)
July 24, 2020 Filing 33 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sprirax Sarco Inc.(Techman, Jennifer)
July 24, 2020 Filing 32 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by General Electric Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
July 24, 2020 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint by Sprirax Sarco Inc.(Techman, Jennifer)
July 24, 2020 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint by General Electric Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
July 23, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie G Flynn on behalf of Ingersoll Rand Inc, Warren Pumps LLC (Flynn, Stephanie)
July 23, 2020 Filing 27 John Crane Inc ANSWER to Complaint by John Crane Inc.(Elliott, James)
July 23, 2020 Filing 26 John Crane Inc Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by John Crane Inc.(Elliott, James)
July 23, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF JOINDER re #1 Notice of Removal by James H Elliott, Jr on behalf of John Crane Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S&C, #2 Exhibit Military Spec, #3 Exhibit Military Spec, #4 Exhibit Qualified Products List, #5 Exhibit State Court Notice of Filing)(Elliott, James)
July 23, 2020 Filing 24 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Warren Pumps LLC.(Cherry, Nicolas)
July 23, 2020 Filing 23 Gardner Denver, Inc. Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ingersoll Rand Inc.(Cherry, Nicolas)
July 23, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Warren Pumps LLC.(Cherry, Nicolas)
July 23, 2020 Filing 21 Gardner Denver, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Ingersoll Rand Inc.(Cherry, Nicolas)
July 23, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicolas John Cherry on behalf of Ingersoll Rand Inc, Warren Pumps LLC (Cherry, Nicolas)
July 23, 2020 Filing 19 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tate Andale LLC.(Inabinet, George)
July 23, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Tate Andale LLC.(Inabinet, George)
July 23, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by George L Inabinet, Jr on behalf of Tate Andale LLC (Inabinet, George)
July 23, 2020 Filing 16 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 10 Reason: Documents filed under incorrect event which appeared as a sealed document. Attorney will refile documents under correct event. (vdru, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Crane Co. (Sullivan, Tara). Attachment from entry #14 removed and filed separately under correct event by Clerk. (vdru, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Crane Co. (Attachments: # 1 LR 26.01 Answers)(Sullivan, Tara) Modified to remove attachment file separately as #15 on 7/22/2020 (vdru, ).
July 20, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ViacomCBS Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/3/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of John Padgett, #2 Exhibit B - Form 10-K 2020)No proposed order.(Techman, Jennifer)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Honeywell International Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by FM Corporation. (Conner, William)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E Frick on behalf of FM Corporation (Frick, Scott)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Moffatt Grier McDonald on behalf of FM Corporation (McDonald, Moffatt)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by FM Corporation.(Conner, William)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by FM Corporation.(Conner, William)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William David Conner on behalf of FM Corporation (Conner, William)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by ViacomCBS Inc.(vdru, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-10-2465. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9222656), filed by ViacomCBS Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffing v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Inc
Represented By: Stephanie G Flynn
Represented By: Nicolas John Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane Technologies Public Limited Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Andale LLC
Represented By: George L Inabinet, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver Holdings Inc
Represented By: Stephanie G Flynn
Represented By: Nicolas John Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Stephanie G Flynn
Represented By: Allyson Rebecca Twilley
Represented By: Nicolas John Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane Technologies Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc
Represented By: James H Elliott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Represented By: William Ansel Collins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldrich Pump LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temco Machine Works Inc
Represented By: George L Inabinet, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co
Represented By: Tara Cloer Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprirax Sarco Inc
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charleston Rubber & Gasket Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FM Corporation
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Represented By: Moffatt Grier McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AW Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Temco Inc
Represented By: George L Inabinet, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circor Instrumentation Technologies Inc A New York Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of South Carolina doing business as Hoke
Represented By: Stephen Michael Kozick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Industrial US Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A Griffing
Represented By: Robert Walker Humphrey, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?