Mobilia Consulting LLC v. Housing Works Inc
Plaintiff: Mobilia Consulting LLC
Defendant: Housing Works Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv02662
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/23/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/24/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/23/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/23/2021, Discovery due by 4/26/2021, Motions due by 5/25/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 8/23/2021, Mediation Due by 4/26/2021. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 9/8/2020. (vdru, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 13 Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Housing Works Inc.(Sumner, Robert)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Housing Works Inc.(Sumner, Robert)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Housing Works Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Amended Scheduling Order)(Sumner, Robert)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Counterclaim #5 by Mobilia Consulting LLC.(Raymond, Bryan)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 1/25/2021, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/30/2020. (vdru, ) .(Main Document 9 replaced on 7/31/2020) (vdru, ). Modified to replace with corrected document on 7/31/2020 (vdru, ).
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/20/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/3/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 9/3/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/24/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/26/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/25/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/25/2020, Discovery due by 1/25/2021, Motions due by 2/24/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 5/25/2021, Mediation Due by 1/25/2021. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/30/2020. (vdru, ) (Main Document 8 replaced on 7/31/2020) (vdru, ). Modified to replace with corrected document on 7/31/2020 (vdru, ).
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mobilia Consulting LLC.(Raymond, Bryan)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Charleston County. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Notice of Removal)(Sumner, Robert)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint Non-Jury Trial Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Mobilia Consulting LLC by Housing Works Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Shared Savings Agreement, #2 Exhibit Addendum to Shared Savings Agreement of March 3, 2019, #3 Exhibit Mobilia Invoice dated 02.29.2020)(Sumner, Robert)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Housing Works Inc.(vdru, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-10-2557. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9224601), filed by Housing Works Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B: Proof of Service).(vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobilia Consulting LLC v. Housing Works Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mobilia Consulting LLC
Represented By: Bryan Andrew Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Works Inc
Represented By: Robert E Sumner, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?