Hartford Fire Insurance Company et al v. Medical Society of South Carolina
Plaintiff: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company and Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Medical Society of South Carolina
Case Number: 2:2020cv02668
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/30/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/14/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 10/14/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/8/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/8/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/8/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/15/2021, Discovery due by 3/8/2021, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 3/22/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for Trial (non-jury) Deadline on or after 7/2/2021 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 9/9/2020. (sshe, ) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/9/2020) (sshe, ). (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/10/2020) (sshe, ). Modified on 9/10/2020 to replace with correct document for case caption(sshe, ).
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Medical Society of South Carolina.(Hess, Chad)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Medical Society of South Carolina served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020.(Mahon, Christy) Filing corrected for event type. (sshe, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Medical Society of South Carolina. (sshe, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company.(sshe, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Medical Society of South Carolina ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9225108.), filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Service due by 10/15/2020(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Fire Insurance Company et al v. Medical Society of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christy E Mahon
Represented By: Brandon Gottschall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Christy E Mahon
Represented By: Brandon Gottschall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Christy E Mahon
Represented By: Brandon Gottschall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Society of South Carolina
Represented By: Chad Brandon Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?