MESTANEK et al v. CUCCINELLI
Plaintiff: ROBERT MESTANEK and MARY MESTANEK
Defendant: KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI, II
Case Number: 2:2020cv02811
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 22 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI, II.(Bowens, Barbara)
August 13, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Murcier Bowens on behalf of KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI, II (Bowens, Barbara)
August 7, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARY MESTANEK, ROBERT MESTANEK. (Banias, Bradley)
August 4, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE to Attorneys re #16 Case Transferred In - District Transfer: Case transferred to the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina, Charleston Division, from the District of Columbia on August 4, 2020. Your answers to Local Rule 26.01 interrogatories must be served and filed no later than ten (10) days after receiving transfer of case. (vdru, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-02971. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 Consent Motion to Transfer and DENYING without prejudice #14 Motion to Lift Stay and to Set Deadlines. This case is TRANSFERRED forthwith to the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/24/2020. (jag) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Lift Stay , Joint MOTION to Transfer Case , Joint MOTION Set Deadlines by KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Minute Entry for Telephone Conference proceedings held on 2/11/2020 in Chambers before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (Court Reporter Lisa Edwards) (zgdf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. This Court held a teleconference with the parties on February 11, 2020. In light of representations made by the parties, and for the reasons the Court explained on the record during that teleconference, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' #13 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendant's #7 Motion to Transfer Case are both DENIED without prejudice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the instant case is STAYED until further order of this Court. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 02/11/2020. (lckbj3, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 13 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MARY MESTANEK, ROBERT MESTANEK (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A: 2017 NOID, #3 Exhibit B: Refusal to Inspect, #4 Exhibit C: 2017 FOIA Response, #5 Exhibit D: 2020 NOID, #6 Exhibit E: 2020 Request to Inspect, #7 Exhibit F: AS's Statement Request, #8 Exhibit G: AS's Declaration, #9 Exhibit H: AS's written statement, #10 Exhibit I: 2020 Refusal to Inspect, #11 Exhibit J: Car Registration)(Banias, Bradley) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the obligation of Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is STAYED until further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/11/2019. (jag) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Intent to File Motion to Dismiss by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II (Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by MARY MESTANEK, ROBERT MESTANEK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Wells v. Cuccinelli)(Banias, Bradley) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II. (Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2020.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II (Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/15/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of service)(Banias, Bradley) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO APA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for batching motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/10/2019. (jag) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET Corrected by ROBERT MESTANEK, MARY MESTANEK re #1 Complaint, filed by ROBERT MESTANEK, MARY MESTANEK. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by MARY MESTANEK, ROBERT MESTANEK.(Banias, Bradley) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2020.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6414448) filed by Robert Mestanek, Mary Mestanek. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Banias, Bradley) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/18/2019) (znmw). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/18/2019) (znmw). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/4/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MESTANEK et al v. CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI, II
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Represented By: Barbara Murcier Bowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT MESTANEK
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY MESTANEK
Represented By: Bradley Bruce Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?