Shapiro v. Hyper Healing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eric Shapiro
Defendant: Joseph E. Nolan, Hyper Healing LLC and Trident Pain Center LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv03115
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 40 TEXT ORDER granting (20) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 2:19-cv-03583-BHH; and granting (34) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 2:20-cv-03115-BHH. Case number, 2:19-cv-03583-BHH, is designated as the LEAD case, with case number 2:20-cv-3115-BHH, as the CONSOLIDATED Case. It is ordered that Plaintiff Shapiro's claims in the Consolidated Case, are realigned as counterclaims in the Lead Case, 2:19-cv-3583. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 9/14/2020.Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-03115-BHH, 2:19-cv-03583-BHH(vdru, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 39 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Trident Pain Center LLC.(Smith, Jason)
September 14, 2020 Filing 38 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Joseph E. Nolan.(Smith, Jason)
September 14, 2020 Filing 37 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Hyper Healing LLC(a South Carolina Limited Liability Company).(Smith, Jason)
September 14, 2020 Filing 36 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Hyper Healing LLC(a Florida Foreign Limited Liability Company).(Smith, Jason)
September 10, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Severin Smith on behalf of Hyper Healing LLC(a Florida Foreign Limited Liability Company), Hyper Healing LLC(a South Carolina Limited Liability Company), Joseph E. Nolan, Trident Pain Center LLC (Smith, Jason)
September 10, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Eric Shapiro. Response to Motion due by 9/24/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Buckingham, Steven)
September 2, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Edward Buckingham on behalf of Eric Shapiro (Buckingham, Steven)
September 1, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE to Attorneys re Case Transferred In - District Transfer: Case transferred to the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina, Charleston Division, from the Middle District of Florida on 8/31/2020. Your answers to Local Rule 26.01 interrogatories must be served and filed no later than ten (10) days after receiving transfer of case. (vdru, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:20-cv-01268. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Transfer; denying as moot #17 Motion to Stay Discovery, and directing Clerk to effect transfer to the U.S. District Court in South Carolina, Charleston Division, and thereafter close case. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 8/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (CCB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 27 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge William F. Jung: MOTION HEARING held on 8/28/2020 re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, Transfer, or Stay, or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Joseph E. Nolan, Hyper Healing, LLC, and Trident Pain Center, LLC. Order to follow. Court Reporter: Scott N. Gamertsfelder (SAO) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, Transfer, or Stay, or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by Hyper Healing, LLC(a Florida Foreign Limited Liability Company), Hyper Healing, LLC(a South Carolina Limited Liability Company), Joseph E. Nolan, Trident Pain Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - South Carolina District Court's Order dated August 27, 2020)(Wood, David) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER: The parties may address the attached tomorrow. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 8/27/2020. (Jung, William) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, Transfer, or Stay, or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Eric Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Stanton, Thomas) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of TELEPHONIC HEARING on all pending motions, including #16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, Transfer, or Stay, or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement, #17 MOTION to Stay Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2020 at 9:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Counsel are directed to call the reserved conference toll free number at 1-888-557-8511. Enter the access code: 4744914 followed by the #(pound) key. You will be prompted to enter the security code: 1268 followed by the #(pound) key. This conference will be activated at 9:00 AM so the hearing may start promptly at 9:30 AM.(CCB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Other Proceedings filed by Eric Shapiro. (Stanton, Thomas) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive motions due by 8/31/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2022 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15B before Judge William F. Jung, Jury Trial set for the February 2022 trial term commencing 2/07/2022 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15B before Judge William F. Jung. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 8/12/2020. (SAO) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Stanton, Thomas) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response #16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, Transfer, or Stay, or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement. Response due by 8/26/2020. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 8/7/2020. (CCB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, Transfer, or Stay, or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Stanton, Thomas) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Other Proceedings by All Defendants. (Wood, David) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, Transfer, or Stay, or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - South Carolina Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cease and Desist Demand, #3 Exhibit 3 - Response to Cease and Desist Demand, #4 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 4 - Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue in South Carolina Litigation, and Briefing)(Wood, David) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Eric Shapiro. Related case(s): Yes (Stanton, Thomas) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Eric Shapiro. (Stanton, Thomas) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Hyper Healing, LLC(a Florida Foreign Limited Liability Company), Hyper Healing, LLC(a South Carolina Limited Liability Company), Joseph E. Nolan, Trident Pain Center, LLC. (Wood, David) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Hyper Healing, LLC(a Florida Foreign Limited Liability Company), Hyper Healing, LLC(a South Carolina Limited Liability Company), Joseph E. Nolan, Trident Pain Center, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Wood, David) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint on or before 8/3/2020. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/1/2020. (CCB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by All Defendants. (Wood, David) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Additional Appearance by Monica Marie McNulty Kovecses on behalf of Hyper Healing, LLC(a Florida Foreign Limited Liability Company), Hyper Healing, LLC(a South Carolina Limited Liability Company), Joseph E. Nolan, Trident Pain Center, LLC. (McNulty Kovecses, Monica) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David Storrs Wood on behalf of Hyper Healing, LLC(a Florida Foreign Limited Liability Company), Hyper Healing, LLC(a South Carolina Limited Liability Company), Joseph E. Nolan, Trident Pain Center, LLC. (Wood, David) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Hyper Healing, LLC, Hyper Healing, LLC, Joseph E. Nolan, Trident Pain Center, LLC. (BES) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Eric Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Stanton, Thomas) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Eric Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Stanton, Thomas) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/4/2020. (SAO) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (TDC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:20-cv-1268-T-02CPT. (SJB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16886063) filed by Eric Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Exhibit A, #2 Plaintiff's Exhibit B, #3 Plaintiff's Exhibit C, #4 Plaintiff's Exhibit D, #5 Plaintiff's Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stanton, Thomas) (Counsel to refile proposed summons in a editable format for summons to be issued.) Modified on 6/3/2020 (TDC). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 9/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shapiro v. Hyper Healing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph E. Nolan
Represented By: David Storrs Wood
Represented By: Monica Marie McNulty Kovecses
Represented By: Jason Severin Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyper Healing LLC
Represented By: David Storrs Wood
Represented By: Monica Marie McNulty Kovecses
Represented By: Jason Severin Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trident Pain Center LLC
Represented By: David Storrs Wood
Represented By: Monica Marie McNulty Kovecses
Represented By: Jason Severin Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Shapiro
Represented By: Thomas Herbert Stanton
Represented By: Steven Edward Buckingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?