Warren v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Warren
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC, 3M Company, ViacomCBS Inc, Foster Wheeler LLC, Cleaver Brooks Inc, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC, ASCO Valve Inc, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Elliott Company, A W Chesterton Company, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, General Electric Company, Viacom Inc, Ingersoll Rand Company, Carrier Corporation, ITT LLC, Parker Hannifin Corporation, Crane Co, Alfa Laval Inc, Circor Instrumentation Technologies Inc doing business as Hoke, Goulds Pumps Incorporated, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, BW/IP Inc, Charleston Rubber & Gasket Co, Union Carbide Corporation, CBS Corporation, IMO Industries Inc and Spirax Sarco Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv03258
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Referring Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 34 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Parker Hannifin Corporation.(Cox, Ronald)
October 29, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald B Cox on behalf of Parker Hannifin Corporation (Cox, Ronald)
October 26, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER to 2:20-cv-3258-BHH. Please use this case number on future filings. (vdru, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Cynthia Warren. (Humphrey, Robert)
October 23, 2020 Filing 29 Case Reassigned to Judge Bruce Howe Hendricks. Judge Margaret B Seymour no longer assigned to the case. (suro, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by ViacomCBS Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/23/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Padgett Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Ex B General Conditions of Contract, #3 Exhibit Ex C Forman Report)(Techman, Jennifer)
October 12, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Cynthia Warren. Response to Motion due by 10/26/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit Naval Employment Records, #3 Exhibit ViacomCBS Answer)No proposed order.(Humphrey, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Filing 26 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by ITT LLC.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Filing 25 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Goulds Pumps LLC.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Filing 24 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Elliott Company.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Filing 23 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Carrier Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Filing 22 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Filing 21 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Alfa Laval Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 25, 2020 Filing 19 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Cleaver Brooks Inc.(McLeod, Yancey)
September 25, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Yancey Alford McLeod, III on behalf of Cleaver Brooks Inc (McLeod, Yancey)
September 25, 2020 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by BW/IP Inc.(McLeod, Yancey)
September 25, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Yancey Alford McLeod, III on behalf of BW/IP Inc (McLeod, Yancey)
September 25, 2020 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Warren Pumps LLC.(Cherry, Nicolas)
September 25, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicolas John Cherry on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Cherry, Nicolas)
September 24, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by ITT LLC.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Goulds Pumps LLC.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Elliott Company.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Carrier Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Alfa Laval Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by G Mark Phillips on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Carrier Corporation (Phillips, G)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas A Charles on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval Inc, Carrier Corporation, Elliott Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, ITT LLC (Charles, Nicholas)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James B Glenn on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval Inc, Carrier Corporation, Elliott Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, ITT LLC (Glenn, James)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert O Meriwether on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval Inc, Carrier Corporation, Elliott Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, ITT LLC (Meriwether, Robert)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by ViacomCBS Inc.(vdru, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-10-5817. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9337363), filed by ViacomCBS Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit A: Complaint, #3 Exhibit B: Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C: Responses to Master Discovery, #5 Exhibit D: Responses to Standard Discovery, #6 Exhibit E: Supp Responses to Standard Discovery).(vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Nicholas A Charles
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver Brooks Inc
Represented By: Yancey Alford McLeod, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas A Charles
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Stephanie G Flynn
Represented By: Allyson Rebecca Twilley
Represented By: Nicolas John Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCO Valve Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: Nicholas A Charles
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A W Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas A Charles
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC
Represented By: Nicholas A Charles
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Ronald B Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval Inc
Represented By: Nicholas A Charles
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circor Instrumentation Technologies Inc doing business as Hoke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps Incorporated
Represented By: Nicholas A Charles
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP Inc
Represented By: Yancey Alford McLeod, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charleston Rubber & Gasket Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Warren
Represented By: Robert Walker Humphrey, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?