Jones et al v. Allura USA LLC et al
Plaintiff: John Does 1-100, Clifford Jones and Jane Does 1-100
Defendant: Allura USA LLC, Plycem USA Inc and Plycem USA LLC doing business as Allura
Case Number: 2:2020cv03492
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Clifford Jones.(Meola, Nina)
November 14, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Join Additional Defendants by Clifford Jones. Response to Motion due by 11/30/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exh. B - Articles of Organization - SE Exteriors, #3 Exhibit Exh. C - Application for Authority to Transact Business - Crescent Homes, #4 Exhibit Exh. D - Purchase and Sale Agreement, #5 Exhibit Exh. E - SE Exteriors Website, #6 Exhibit Exh. F - Crescent Website)No proposed order.(Meola, Nina)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall have until November 14, 2020 to file a motion to remand. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 10/15/2020.(jbry, )
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Response to Motion due by 12/3/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 10/15/2020.(jbry, )
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Plaintiffs shall have until November 28, 2020 to file responses to the Rule 26 Interrogatories. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 10/15/2020.(jbry, )
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand by Clifford Jones. Response to Motion due by 10/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Meola, Nina)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Clifford Jones. Response to Motion due by 10/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Meola, Nina)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Clifford Jones. Response to Motion due by 10/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Meola, Nina)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Allura USA LLC, Plycem USA Inc, Plycem USA LLC. Response to Motion due by 10/19/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Buckley, Edward)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Allura USA LLC, Plycem USA Inc, Plycem USA LLC.(Buckley, Edward)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Allura USA LLC, Plycem USA Inc, Plycem USA LLC.(jbry, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dorchester County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-18-00940. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9378026), filed by Allura USA LLC, Plycem USA Inc, Plycem USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Allura USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Jones
Represented By: Nina Elizabeth Meola
Represented By: John C Hayes, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allura USA LLC
Represented By: Edward D Buckley, Jr
Represented By: William Cole Shannon
Represented By: Nicholas James Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plycem USA Inc
Represented By: Edward D Buckley, Jr
Represented By: William Cole Shannon
Represented By: Nicholas James Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plycem USA LLC doing business as Allura
Represented By: Edward D Buckley, Jr
Represented By: William Cole Shannon
Represented By: Nicholas James Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?