New Jersey-American Water Company Inc v. EI DuPont De Nemours & Co et al
Plaintiff: New Jersey-American Water Company, Inc.
Defendant: EI DuPont De Nemours and Company and Chemours Company, The
Case Number: 2:2020cv03520
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 65 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New Jersey, 1:18-cv-02767, New Jersey-American Water Company Inc v. EI DuPont De Nemours and Company et al, as DSC case 2:20-cv-3520-RMG (sshe, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 64 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 1:18-cv-02767. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the District of South Carolina. (dd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 62 Letter from Lanny Kurzweil, Esq. on behalf of Defendants E. I. du Pont de Nemours & Company and The Chemours Company FC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(KURZWEIL, LANNY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 61 Letter from Lanny S. Kurzweil to Judge Williams. (KURZWEIL, LANNY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 60 Letter from Stephen T. Sullivan, Jr.. (SULLIVAN, STEPHEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 59 Letter from Lanny S. Kurzweil, Esq. Counsel for E. I. du Pont de Nemours & Company (DuPont) and The Chemours Company FC, LLC to Hon. Karen M. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(KURZWEIL, LANNY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Discovery Conference held on 5/13/2020. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 TEXT ORDER On or before June 12, 2020, defendant shall file a Motion with the MDL Panel. The instant case is STAYED until the panel decides said Motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/13/20. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 TEXT ORDER The Court has scheduled a telephone status conference for May 13, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. to address the letter dated May 7, 2020 from John E. Keefe, Jr., Esquire, counsel for plaintiff #55 , and the letter dated May 8, 2020 from Lanny S. Kurzweil, Esquire, counsel for defendants #56 . All counsel shall dial 1-888-684-8852, Code: 1488577# to join the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/11/20. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 56 Letter from Lanny S. Kurzweil, Esq. re #55 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KURZWEIL, LANNY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 55 Letter from John E. Keefe, Jr.. (KEEFE, JOHN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/24/2020. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 TEXT ORDER The Court has scheduled a telephone status conference for May 29, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 3/24/20. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 TEXT ORDER In light of the December 23, 2019 Scheduling Order, the telephone status conference previously set for January 9, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. is hereby ADJOURNED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/9/20. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/24/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Discovery is hereby STAYED pending private mediation, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 12/23/2019. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TEXT ORDER Due to a scheduling conflict, the telephone status conference scheduled for December 20, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. is ADJOURNED. The new date and time for the telephone status conference is January 9, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 12/20/2019. (Solomon, D) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 50 Letter from Stephen T. Sullivan, Jr. (SULLIVAN, STEPHEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TEXT ORDER Due to a scheduling conflict, the telephone status conference scheduled for December 6, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. has been ADJOURNED. The new date and time for the telephone status conference is December 20, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 12/06/2019. (Solomon, D) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 48 Letter from Lanny S. Kurzweil, Esquire re 47 Order, Set Hearings. (KURZWEIL, LANNY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TEXT ORDER The Court has scheduled a telephone status conference for December 6, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 12/04/2019. (Solomon, D) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting letter request to provide the Court with a status letter within twoo weeks regarding mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/5/2019. (dmr,) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 45 Letter from Stephen T. Sullivan, Jr.. (SULLIVAN, STEPHEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/18/2019. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Frederick T. Kuykendall Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/1/2019. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ORDER In light of the letter dated September 19, 2019 from John E. Keefe, Jr., Esquire, counsel for plaintiff, the Court hereby reschedules the telephone status conference previously set for September 23, 2019. The new date and time of the telephone status conference is October 18, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/20/19. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 42 Letter from John E. Keefe, Jr.. (KEEFE, JOHN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by NEW JERSEY - AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Stephen T. Sullivan, Jr., #2 Certification of Frederick T. Kuykendall, III, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(SULLIVAN, STEPHEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
June 17, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status and Discovery Conference held on 6/17/2019. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 6/17/2019. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated February 28, 2019 from Lanny S. Kurzweil, Esquire, counsel for defendants, and it appearing that all counsel consent to the request to schedule a telephone status conference, the Court hereby GRANTS the request. The telephone status conference is scheduled for June 17, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 3/1/19. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 38 Letter from Lanny S. Kurzweil. (KURZWEIL, LANNY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
February 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/11/2019. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER - On or before February 28, 2019, Counsel shall submit a revised proposed joint discovery plan. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on February 11, 2019. (Williams, Karen) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re: PROTOCOL FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 2/8/2019. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 35 Letter from STEPHEN T. SULLIVAN, JR.. (SULLIVAN, STEPHEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/31/2019. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 33 Letter from Stephen T. Sullivan, Jr.. (SULLIVAN, STEPHEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 2/11/2019 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. All remaining case deadlines shall be reset during the February 11, 2019, telephone status conference, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/7/2019. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
January 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/7/2019. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
September 28, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/28/2018. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/7/2019 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/28/2018. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
August 24, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JANINE L. FABEN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 30 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Janine L. Faben to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8977717.) (KURZWEIL, LANNY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
August 23, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee Received: $ 150, receipt number TRE094658 as to T. Roe Frazier II, Esquire. (jjc) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE by CHEMOURS COMPANY, E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & CO. re #19 Joint Discovery Plan Notice of Service of Defendant E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Co.'s First Set of Interrogatories and First Requests for Production Directed to Plaintiff and Defendant The Chemours Company FC, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories and First Requests for Production Directed to Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KURZWEIL, LANNY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
July 26, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE by CHEMOURS COMPANY, E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & CO. re #1 Complaint Notice of Service of Defendants' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26(a) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KURZWEIL, LANNY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
July 26, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Janine L. Faben, Esquire: $ 150, receipt number CAM009827 (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to T. Roe Frazier II, Esquire; shall make a payment of $150.00 on each admission, payable to the Clerk, United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 7/20/2018. (tf, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Janine L. Faben, Esquire; shall make a payment of $150.00 on each admission, payable to the Clerk, United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 7/20/2018. (tf, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 25 Certification of T. Roe Frazer II, Esq. on behalf of NEW JERSEY - AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, INC. Re #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(SULLIVAN, STEPHEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 24 Certification on behalf of CHEMOURS COMPANY, E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & CO. Re 21 Order,,,. (KURZWEIL, LANNY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone status Conference set for 9/28/2018 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Pretrial factual Discovery due by 1/25/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 7/10/18. (jbk, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
July 10, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: In-Person Initial Conference held on 7/10/2018. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER The Certification in Support of the Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by NEW JERSEY - AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, INC. [Doc. No. 17-1] does not comply with L. Civ. R. 101.1(c)(1). Within ten (10) days of the date of this Text Order, the party filing this pro hac vice motion shall file an amended certified statement of the pro hac vice applicant (1) certifying that no disciplinary proceedings are pending against the attorney in any jurisdiction and no discipline has previously been imposed on the attorney in any jurisdiction; and (2) certifying the required bar admission information, or in lieu thereof, attaching a certificate of good standing. See www.njd.uscourts.gov/court-info/local-rules-and-orders. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 7/10/2018. (Solomon, D) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER The Certification in Support of the Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by CHEMOURS COMPANY, E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & CO. [Doc. No. 16] does not include the name and address of the official or office maintaining the roll of the members of each bar to which the applicant is admitted as required by L. Civ. R. 101.1(c)(1). Within ten (10) days of the date of this Text Order, the party filing this pro hac vice motion [Doc. No. 14] shall file an amended certified statement of the applicant as set forth in the amendment to L. Civ. R. 101.1(c) (1) (eff. March 1, 2010); or in lieu thereof, may attach a certificate of good standing. See www.njd.uscourts.gov/court-info/local-rules-and-orders. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 7/10/2018. (Solomon, D) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 20 Letter from Lanny S. Kurzweil, Esquire re #19 Joint Discovery Plan. (KURZWEIL, LANNY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 19 Joint Discovery Plan by CHEMOURS COMPANY, E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & CO..(KURZWEIL, LANNY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER The parties shall submit a Joint Discovery Plan to the Court no later than the time period provided for in L.Civ.R. 26.1(b)(2). The form to be used for the Joint Discovery Plan can be retrieved from: http://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/R16DiscoveryPlanCamONLY.pdf. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 6/28/18. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
June 20, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 7/16/2018 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by NEW JERSEY - AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of T. Roe Frazer II, #2 Certification of Stephen T. Sullivan, Jr., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(SULLIVAN, STEPHEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
June 12, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by CHEMOURS COMPANY, E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & CO. re #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Janine L. Faben, Esquire (KURZWEIL, LANNY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
June 11, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Janine L. Faben, Esquire. Motion set for 7/2/2018 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
June 11, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Certification of Janine L. Faben attached to the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice #14 submitted by LANNY KURZWEIL on 6/8/2018 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER SCANNED SIGNATURE using the "Certification" event found under Responses and Replies.. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 15 Letter from Lanny S. Kurzweil, Esquire re #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Janine L. Faben, Esquire. (KURZWEIL, LANNY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Janine L. Faben, Esquire by CHEMOURS COMPANY, E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & CO.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Lanny S. Kurzweil, Esquire in Support of Motion for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Janine L. Faben, Esquire, #2 Certification of Janine L. Faben, Esquire in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Consent Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Janine L. Faben, Esquire, #4 Certificate of Service)(KURZWEIL, LANNY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated June 7, 2018 from Stephen T. Sullivan, Jr., Esquire, counsel for plaintiff, and it appearing that all counsel consent to the request to reschedule the in-person Initial Conference previously set for June 28, 2018, the Court hereby GRANTS the request. The new date and time of the in-person Initial Conference is July 10, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. in Room 2040 - Camden. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 6/8/18. (nar) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
June 7, 2018 Filing 12 Letter from Stephen T. Sullivan, Jr.. (SULLIVAN, STEPHEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Initial Conference set for 6/28/2018 at 11:30 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/31/2018. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHEMOURS COMPANY. (KURZWEIL, LANNY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & CO.. (KURZWEIL, LANNY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by CHEMOURS COMPANY, E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & CO.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KURZWEIL, LANNY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
May 10, 2018 Clerk's Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CHEMOURS COMPANY, E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & CO. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/28/2018. (dmr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL for CHEMOURS COMPANY,LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL for E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & CO. added. (KURZWEIL, LANNY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NEW JERSEY - AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, INC.. CHEMOURS COMPANY waiver sent on 3/14/2018, answer due 5/14/2018. (SULLIVAN, STEPHEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NEW JERSEY - AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, INC.. E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & CO. waiver sent on 3/14/2018, answer due 5/14/2018. (SULLIVAN, STEPHEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
March 16, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEW JERSEY - AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, INC.. (SULLIVAN, STEPHEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
March 16, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jbk, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
March 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN T. SULLIVAN, JR on behalf of NEW JERSEY - AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, INC. (SULLIVAN, STEPHEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
February 27, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future, when choosing parties, please choose each party individually. Do not select all plaintiffs or all defendants . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jbk, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
February 27, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHEMOURS COMPANY, E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & CO. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *JAIME KASSELMAN* (jbk, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
February 27, 2018 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]
February 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8509964), filed by NEW JERSEY - AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEEFE, JOHN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Jersey-American Water Company Inc v. EI DuPont De Nemours & Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EI DuPont De Nemours and Company
Represented By: LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company, The
Represented By: LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Jersey-American Water Company, Inc.
Represented By: John E Keefe, Jr
Represented By: Stephen T. Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?