League of Women Voters of South Carolina et al v. Andino et al
Plaintiff: Family Unit Inc, The, League of Women Voters of South Carolina, George Hopkins and Albertus Clea
Defendant: Clifford J Edler, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, Howard M Knapp, Marci Andino, JoAnne Day and John Wells
Intervenor Defendant: Senator Harvey Peeler, James H. (Jay) Lucas and Representative James H. (Jay) Lucas
Amicus Curiae: South Carolina Alliance for Retired Americans and Attorney General Alan Wilson
Case Number: 2:2020cv03537
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 80 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Intervenor Defendants by James H. (Jay) Lucas. Response to Motion due by 12/7/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(McWilliams, Susan)
November 23, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Clifford J Edler, Howard M Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells. Response to Motion due by 12/7/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Lambert, William)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER of USCA granting partial stay of the district court's injunction as to #74 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Harvey Peeler, Howard M Knapp, Scott Moseley, John Wells, Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Linda McCall, Clifford J Edler, James H. (Jay) Lucas (sshe, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 77 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Marc E. Elias ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9438935) by South Carolina Alliance for Retired Americans. Response to Motion due by 11/12/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit/Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)No proposed order.(Tobin, Thomas)
October 28, 2020 Filing 75 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA re #74 Notice of Appeal,, The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (sshe, )
October 27, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #72 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, by Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Clifford J Edler, Howard M Knapp, James H. (Jay) Lucas, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, Harvey Peeler, John Wells. - Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0420-9436001. The Docketing Statement form, Transcript Order form and CJA 24 form may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov (Lambert, William) (Main Document 74 replaced on 10/28/2020) (sshe, ). Modified on 10/28/2020 to replace with corrected document as provided by filing user(sshe, ).
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: The Court hereby ENJOINS the State and any of its affiliate county boards from utilizing signature matching procedures to disqualify otherwise validly submitted absentee ballots unless affected voters are provided timely notice of the disqualified ballot and a timely procedure to contest that determination before a neutral tribunal. [Details set forth in Order] Defendants are directed to promptly provide a copy of this Order to county boards and to confirm receipt. Further, the Court DENIES Plaintiffs motion for injunctive relief on all other grounds, as set forth in Sections III (A), (B), and (C. (Dkt. Nos. 21; 41). AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/27/20.(ltap, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 71 DECLARATION by Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Clifford J Edler, Howard M Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells. (Attachments: #1 Fourth Declaration of Marci Andino)(Lambert, William)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Sopen Shah to Appear Pro Hac Vice for South Carolina Alliance for Retired Americans. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/26/2020.(sshe, )
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #63 Motion for William B. Stafford to Appear Pro Hac Vice for South Carolina Alliance for Retired Americans. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/26/2020.(sshe, )
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Bruce V. Spiva to Appear Pro Hac Vice for South Carolina Alliance for Retired Americans. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/26/2020.(sshe, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 66 AFFIDAVIT re #62 Order, by Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Clifford J Edler, Howard M Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Lambert, William)
October 22, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings. Motion Hearing held on 10/21/2020, before Judge Richard M. Gergel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Karen E. Martin, Telephone number/E-mail Karen_E_Martin@scd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. Redaction Request due 11/12/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/20/2021. (kmartin, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sopen Shah ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9424388) by South Carolina Alliance for Retired Americans. Response to Motion due by 11/4/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit/Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)No proposed order.(Tobin, Thomas)
October 21, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William B. Stafford ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9424384) by South Carolina Alliance for Retired Americans. Response to Motion due by 11/4/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit/Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)No proposed order.(Tobin, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2020: #3 Exhibit Additional Certificate of Good Standing) (sshe, ).
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Defendant Andino has agreed, and is directed, to conduct a survey of all 46 County Boards regarding their use of signature matching procedures and to provide the Court a response to the questions, as outlined in the Order for each County Board, on or before noon on October 26, 2020. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/21/2020. (sshe, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 61 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Richard M Gergel: Telephone Conference on Preliminary Injunction Motion #21 held on 10/21/2020. All parties represented on the call. Update is due to court no later than Noon on Monday, October 26th. Court to issue written order. Court Reporter Karen Martin. (cper, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 60 SUPPLEMENT by James H. (Jay) Lucas, Harvey Peeler to #46 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Notice of Supplemental Authority). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Richardson v. Hughs (5th Cir. Oct. 19, 2020))(Carroll, Matthew)
October 20, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bruce V. Spiva ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9420583) by South Carolina Alliance for Retired Americans. Response to Motion due by 11/3/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit/Application for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)No proposed order.(Tobin, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2020: #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (sshe, ). Modified on 10/21/2020 to add attachment as provided by filing user(sshe, ).
October 20, 2020 Filing 58 AFFIDAVIT of Supplemental Declaration of Marci Andino re #50 Order,, by Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Clifford J Edler, Howard M Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells. (Lambert, William) (Main Document 58 replaced on 10/21/2020) (sshe, ). Modified on 10/21/2020 to replace with corrected signature page provided by filing user(sshe, ).
October 19, 2020 Filing 57 OBJECTIONS by James H. (Jay) Lucas to #49 Amicus Curiae Appearance. (McWilliams, Susan)
October 19, 2020 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Response filed by Albertus Clea, Family Unit Inc, The, George Hopkins, League of Women Voters of South Carolina. (Dunn, Susan)
October 19, 2020 Filing 55 TEXT ORDER: For good cause shown, Plaintiffs motion to extend the time to file their reply brief to 2:00 p.m. on 10/19/20 and leave to file a reply brief up to 20 pages (Dkt No. 54) is granted. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/19/20.(ltap, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 54 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Albertus Clea, Family Unit Inc, The, George Hopkins, League of Women Voters of South Carolina. Response to Motion due by 11/2/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Dunn, Susan)
October 19, 2020 Filing 53 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against All Defendants, filed by George Hopkins, Albertus Clea, Family Unit Inc, The, League of Women Voters of South Carolina. Service due by 1/19/2021 (Dunn, Susan)
October 19, 2020 Filing 52 TEXT ORDER Plaintiffs have moved to file an amended motion for preliminary injunction. (Dkt. No. #41 ). No timely response in opposition has been filed. For good cause shown, the motion is granted. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/19/2020.(sshe, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 51 TEXT ORDER Plaintiffs have moved for leave to file a second amended complaint. (Dkt. No. #40 ). Defendants have filed a memorandum in opposition. (Dkt. No. 47). The amended complaint seeks to add allegations relating to events which have occurred since the filing of the amended complaint. For good cause shown and in accord with FED. CIV. P. 15(a)(2), leave to amend is granted. Plaintiffs are directed to promptly file their second amended complaint. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/19/2020.(sshe, ) Modified text typo on 10/19/2020 (sshe, ).
October 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re Defendant Marci Andino's (Andino) submission of a Declaration and supporting exhibits to the Court in support of the Defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. (Dkt. No. #48 -1). The Court directs Andino to supplement her Declaration on or before noon on October 20, 2020 to provide the information as outlined in the Order. Please see Order for all details. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/17/2020. (sshe, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 49 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Thomas John Tobin on behalf of South Carolina Alliance for Retired Americans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attorney Declaration of Thomas Tobin, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Marc Meredith)(Tobin, Thomas)
October 16, 2020 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Response filed by Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Clifford J Edler, Howard M Knapp, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/23/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Marci Andino)(Lambert, William)
October 16, 2020 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #40 MOTION to Amend/Correct #20 Amended Complaint, Response filed by Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Clifford J Edler, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/23/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Lambert, William)
October 16, 2020 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Intervenor Defendants Response filed by James H. (Jay) Lucas.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/23/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (McWilliams, Susan) Modified on 10/21/2020 to reference #60 Supplement filed 10/20/2020(sshe, ).
October 16, 2020 Filing 45 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by James Emory Smith, Jr on behalf of Alan Wilson. (Smith, James)
October 16, 2020 Filing 44 TEXT ORDER: The South Carolina Alliance of Retired Americans (Alliance) has moved for leave to file a brief amicus curiae. (Dkt. No. 43). The motion is granted so long as the brief is filed by the end of the day of 10/16/20 and parties may reply by 10/19/20. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/16/20.(ltap, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae and Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by South Carolina Alliance for Retired Americans. Response to Motion due by 10/30/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attorney Declaration of Thomas Tobin, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Marc Meredith)No proposed order.(Tobin, Thomas)
October 15, 2020 Filing 42 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs have moved to file an amended complaint (Dkt. No. 40) and an amended motion for preliminary injunction. (Dkt. No. 41). The time for Defendants to respond to these motions is hereby shortened with responses due 10/16/20. Plaintiffs may file a reply on or before 10/19/20. Since FED. R. CIV. P. 15(a)(2) provides that the court should freely give leave [to amend] when justice so requires, parties should anticipate that the motions will be granted and the newly added materials should be addressed in responses and replies due on the Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/15/20. (ltap, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION to Amend/Correct #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Albertus Clea, Family Unit Inc, The, George Hopkins, League of Women Voters of South Carolina. Response to Motion due by 10/28/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Susan K. Dunn, #2 Exhibit Emails relating to SEC 10-07-2020 directive, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Herbert Buell, #4 Exhibit Resume of Buell, #5 Exhibit Report on Richland elections)No proposed order.(Dunn, Susan)
October 14, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION to Amend/Correct #20 Amended Complaint, by Albertus Clea, Family Unit Inc, The, George Hopkins, League of Women Voters of South Carolina. Response to Motion due by 10/28/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed 2nd Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Redline comparing 1st Amended Compaint with 2nd Amended Complaint)No proposed order.(Dunn, Susan)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: The motion of Proposed Intervenors to intervene (Dkt. No. 14) is granted permissively, conditioned on compliance with the schedule previously set by the Court. Thus, Proposed Intervenors may file a memorandum in response to the Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction on or before October 16, 2020 and participate in oral argument set before the Court on October 21, 2020. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/14/20.(ltap, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 38 TEXT ORDER: Alan Wilson, the Attorney General of South Carolina, has moved for leave to file an amicus brief regarding the Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction. (Dkt. No. 31). The Court is advised that the Plaintiffs do not oppose the motion. For good cause shown, the motion is granted. The Attorney General may file an amicus brief on or before 10/16/20. Plaintiffs may file a response by noon on 10/19/20. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/14/20.(ltap, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Intervene by Speaker Lucas and President Peeler Response filed by James H. (Jay) Lucas, Harvey Peeler. (Carroll, Matthew)
October 14, 2020 Filing 36 Additional Attachments to Main Document #31 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief. First attachment description: Local Civ. Rule 7.04 Supplement . (Smith, James)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Tara Ganapathy to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Family Unit Inc, The, George Hopkins, League of Women Voters of South Carolina. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/14/2020.(sshe, )
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Catherine Amirfar to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Family Unit Inc, The, George Hopkins, League of Women Voters of South Carolina. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/14/2020.(sshe, )
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #16 Motion for John Michael Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Family Unit Inc, The, George Hopkins, League of Women Voters of South Carolina. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/14/2020.(sshe, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Alan Wilson. Response to Motion due by 10/28/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Smith, James) Modified on 10/14/2020 to reference #36 Additional Attachments filed 10/14/2020(sshe, ).
October 13, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Intervene by Speaker Lucas and President Peeler Response filed by Albertus Clea, Family Unit Inc, The, George Hopkins, League of Women Voters of South Carolina.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/20/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Dunn, Susan)
October 13, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tara Ganapathy ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9402521) by Family Unit Inc, The, George Hopkins, League of Women Voters of South Carolina. Response to Motion due by 10/27/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application to appear PHV, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Dunn, Susan)
October 13, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Catherine Amirfar ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9402508) by Family Unit Inc, The, George Hopkins, League of Women Voters of South Carolina. Response to Motion due by 10/27/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application to appear PHV, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Dunn, Susan)
October 12, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Hearing on #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2020 at 11:00 AM before Honorable Richard M Gergel. Court Staff needed. The Court will provide call-in instructions.(ltap, )
October 12, 2020 Filing 24 TEXT ORDER: By earlier order, the Court shortened the time for Defendants to file their response to Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction to 10/16/20. (Dkt No. 23). Plaintiffs may file a reply to Defendants response on or before noon on 10/19/20. The Court will conduct a hearing on Plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction on 10/21/20 at 11:00 a.m. via telephone conference. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/12/20. (ltap, )
October 12, 2020 Filing 23 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs have filed a motion for preliminary injunction (Dkt. No. 21). The time for defendants to respond has been shortened to 10/16/20. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/12/20. (ltap, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Expedite by Family Unit Inc, The, George Hopkins, League of Women Voters of South Carolina, Albertus Clea. Response to Motion due by 10/23/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memo in support of Motion to expedite)No proposed order.(Dunn, Susan) Modified on 10/13/2020 to add party as filer(sshe, ).
October 9, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Family Unit Inc, The, George Hopkins, League of Women Voters of South Carolina, Albertus Clea. Response to Motion due by 10/23/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memorandum in support of motion for preliminary injunction, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael McDonald, #3 Supporting Documents Resume of McDonald, #4 Exhibit Declaration of George Hopkins, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Albertus Clea, #6 Exhibit Declaration of LWV of SC, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Family Unit, #8 Supporting Documents Emails from Jefferson, #9 Supporting Documents Chart of rejected Absentee ballots)No proposed order.(Dunn, Susan) Modified on 10/13/2020 to add party as filer(sshe, ).
October 9, 2020 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by George Hopkins, Family Unit Inc, The, League of Women Voters of South Carolina, Albertus Clea. Service due by 1/7/2021 (Dunn, Susan) Modified on 10/13/2020 to include filer not added at time of filing(sshe, ).
October 9, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane W Trinkley on behalf of Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Clifford J Edler, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells (Trinkley, Jane)
October 9, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Crum on behalf of Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Clifford J Edler, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley, John Wells (Crum, Mary)
October 9, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by William Grayson Lambert on behalf of Marci Andino, JoAnne Day, Clifford J Edler, Linda McCall, Scott Moseley (Lambert, William)
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Powers ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9398831) by Family Unit Inc, The, George Hopkins, League of Women Voters of South Carolina. Response to Motion due by 10/23/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application to appear PHV, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Dunn, Susan)
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Todd Carroll on behalf of Harvey Peeler (Carroll, Matthew)
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Intervene by Speaker Lucas and President Peeler by James H. (Jay) Lucas. Response to Motion due by 10/23/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(McWilliams, Susan)
October 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Carroll Moore on behalf of James H. (Jay) Lucas (Moore, Mark)
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Pedrick McWilliams on behalf of James H. (Jay) Lucas (McWilliams, Susan)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Richard M Gergel. Judge Honorable J Michelle Childs no longer assigned to the case. Determined that this case is not related to 3:20-1730 or 3:20-1552. (glev, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Scott Moseley. (asni, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Linda McCall. (asni, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Clifford J Edler. (asni, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to JoAnne Day. (asni, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to John Wells. (asni, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Howard M Knapp. (asni, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Marci Andino. (asni, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Family Unit Inc, The, George Hopkins, League of Women Voters of South Carolina.(asni, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9384825.), filed by George Hopkins, Family Unit Inc, The, League of Women Voters of South Carolina. Service due by 12/31/2020(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: League of Women Voters of South Carolina et al v. Andino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Family Unit Inc, The
Represented By: Susan King Dunn
Represented By: Shirene Carole Hansotia
Represented By: John Michael Powers
Represented By: Catherine Amirfar
Represented By: Tara Ganapathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters of South Carolina
Represented By: Susan King Dunn
Represented By: Shirene Carole Hansotia
Represented By: John Michael Powers
Represented By: Catherine Amirfar
Represented By: Tara Ganapathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Hopkins
Represented By: Susan King Dunn
Represented By: Shirene Carole Hansotia
Represented By: John Michael Powers
Represented By: Catherine Amirfar
Represented By: Tara Ganapathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albertus Clea
Represented By: Susan King Dunn
Represented By: Shirene Carole Hansotia
Represented By: John Michael Powers
Represented By: Catherine Amirfar
Represented By: Tara Ganapathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford J Edler
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda McCall
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Moseley
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard M Knapp
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marci Andino
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JoAnne Day
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wells
Represented By: Jane W Trinkley
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Crum
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Senator Harvey Peeler
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Represented By: Kevin A Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: James H. (Jay) Lucas
Represented By: Mark Carroll Moore
Represented By: Susan Pedrick McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Representative James H. (Jay) Lucas
Represented By: Mark Carroll Moore
Represented By: Susan Pedrick McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: South Carolina Alliance for Retired Americans
Represented By: Thomas John Tobin
Represented By: William Ben Stafford
Represented By: Sopen B Shah
Represented By: Bruce V Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Attorney General Alan Wilson
Represented By: James Emory Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?