Charleston, City of v. Brabham Oil Company Inc et al
Plaintiff: Charleston, City of
Defendant: Chevron Corporation, Enmark Stations Inc, BP America Inc, Brabham Oil Company Inc, Piedmont Petroleum Corp, Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Murphy Oil USA Inc, Phillips 66, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Colonial Pipeline Company, ConocoPhillips Company, Hess Corporation, Shell Oil Company, Colonial Group Inc, Phillips 66 Company, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Murphy Oil Corporation, Exxonmobil Oil Corporation, Chevron USA Inc, BP PLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation, ConocoPhillips and Speedway LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv03579
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Chevron Corporation, Chevron USA Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Smith, Joel)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Calhoun Watson on behalf of Brabham Oil Company Inc (Watson, Joseph)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Chevron Corporation, Chevron USA Inc.(vdru, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-10-3975. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9399788), filed by Chevron USA Inc, Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1: State Court Docs Part 1, #3 Exhibit State Court Docs Part 2, #4 Exhibit 2: LongInactive Oilfield Is Open for Now - NY Times, #5 Exhibit 3:Elk Hills Reserve Oil Will Flow Again - NY Times, #6 Exhibit 4:Lease (1), #7 Exhibit 5:Lease (2), #8 Exhibit 6:Lease (3), #9 Exhibit 7:Lease (4), #10 Exhibit 8:1946 03 02 Elk Hills Report, #11 Exhibit 9:121 Cong. Rec. S903-11 (Jan. 27, 1975), #12 Exhibit 10: H.R. Doc. No. 93-406 (1974), #13 Exhibit 11:G.S. Callendar,, #14 Exhibit 12:W.K., How Industry May Change Climate, N.Y. Times (May 24, 1953), #15 Exhibit 13:Time Magazine, Invisible Blanket (May 25, 1953), #16 Exhibit 14:Washington Post, Industrial Gases Warming Up Earth, Physicist Notes H, #17 Exhibit 15:57 12 08 Teller Sees World Flooding Peril (Wash Post) A1, #18 Exhibit 16:Second Supplemental Appropriation Bill, 1956, #19 Exhibit 17:Daniel P. Moynihan, Memorandum (Sept. 17, 1969), #20 Exhibit 18:IPCC (1990) at 254, #21 Exhibit 19:IPCC (1995) at 22, #22 Exhibit 20:IPCC (2001) at 10, #23 Exhibit 21:U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Guide to Climate Change, #24 Exhibit 22:Gulf of Mex. Region, Prod. by Operator Ranked by Vol., #25 Exhibit 23:Hearings Before The Comm on Naval Affs of the House of Repres on Est, #26 Exhibit 24:Yergin_The Prize, #27 Exhibit 25:Hakes_Declaration of Energy Independence, #28 Exhibit 26:H.R. Rep. 95-590, #29 Exhibit 27:HCRCHCVX, #30 Exhibit 28:Grey Bowers Ltr, #31 Exhibit 29:Dear Operator Ltr from L. Denett (Dec 14, 1999), #32 Exhibit 30:US Dept of the Interior_Minerals Management Service (May 31, 2007), #33 Exhibit 31:History of the Petroleum Administration for War 1941-1945 (excerpts), #34 Exhibit 32:TX-76, #35 Exhibit 33:ertificate of Dissolution of War Emergency Pipelines, Inc. (Aug. 28, #36 Exhibit 34:4th Annual Rpt of the Activities of the Jt Comtt on Defense Prod at 1, #37 Exhibit 35:24_annual_rept, #38 Exhibit 36:S.J. Res. 176_Naval Petroleum Reserve Numbered 1, Elk Hills, Calif, #39 Exhibit 37: FUEL IS DIVERTED FOR THE MILITARY - The New York Times, #40 Exhibit 38:Gregory W. Pedlow & Donald E. Welzenbach, The Central Intelligence Ag, #41 Exhibit 39:CIA Doc. No. CIA-RDP90B00170R000100080001-5 (Aug 3, 1981), #42 Exhibit 40: 1994 Rich, Lockheed Skunk Works, #43 Exhibit 41: CIA Doc No. CIA-RDP67B00074R000500400016-2, Contract No. AF33(657)-85, #44 Exhibit 42:CIA-RDP67B00074R000500400012-6, #45 Exhibit 43:CIA-RDP67B00074R000500440005-0, #46 Exhibit 44:CIA RDP67B00074R000500450004-0, #47 Exhibit 45:CIA-RDP67B00074R000500440006-9, #48 Exhibit 46:CIA-RDP67B00074R000500430003-3, #49 Exhibit 47: CIA-RDP67B00074R000500420006-1, #50 Exhibit 48:CIA-RDP67, #51 Exhibit 49: CIA-RDP63-00313A000500130031-9, #52 Exhibit 50:Detail Specification Turbine Fuels, Aviation, Kerosene Types, #53 Exhibit 51:Engg Circ 1105-2-186, #54 Exhibit 52:ETL_1100, #55 Exhibit 53:Cong. Rec. S1157-65 (daily ed. Feb. 9, 2005) (statement of Sen. Mark, #56 Exhibit 54:House Report No. 94-1084 Part 1, #57 Exhibit 55:1942-08-12; Discipline for Non-Compliant Refiners, #58 Exhibit 56:Aircraft Fuels & Propellants, Rpt, #59 Exhibit 57:Military Aviation and the Environment Historical Trends, #60 Exhibit 58:Coordinating Research Councils Handbook of Aviation Fuel Prop, #61 Exhibit 59:1941-08-11; Ickes Davis Speech Transcript of Meeting (excerpt), #62 Exhibit 60:2020-10-08 Tesoro Contract RFP Exhibit Table (003), #63 Exhibit 61:1953.05.05.Charleston News and Courier, #64 Exhibit 62: 1959.05.30.Charleston evening Post, #65 Exhibit 63: History of Naval Petroleum Reserve No. 1, #66 Exhibit 64: Growing Blanket of Carbon Dioxide Raises Earths Temp, #67 Exhibit 65: Dept of Defenses Handbook Aerospace Fuels Cert, #68 Certificate of Service, #69 Supporting Documents Declaration of Joshua Dick).(vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charleston, City of v. Brabham Oil Company Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Corporation
Represented By: Joel Haywood Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enmark Stations Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brabham Oil Company Inc
Represented By: Joseph Calhoun Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piedmont Petroleum Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Dutch Shell PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Products Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Oil USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips 66
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Pipeline Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips 66 Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Oil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxonmobil Oil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron USA Inc
Represented By: Joel Haywood Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charleston, City of
Represented By: Daniel S McQueeney, Jr
Represented By: Susan Jeanne Herdina
Represented By: Joseph P Griffith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?