Russo et al v. Eastwood Construction Partners LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dolores Smiley, Jason Pogar, Kathleen Harvey, Juliann Callery, Jeremy Sheltra, Maria Turner, Peter Fortner, Megan Felkel, Brianna Bendik, Kyle Grego, Ahmad Lewis, Nicole Floyd, Mary Russo, Lynn Washington, Randy Brown, Jeremy McNeer, Neverrol Thompson, Sanchelle Johnson, Wendi O'Brien, Sherryl Anderson, Janelle Wright, Christian Hallock, Janica Hunter, Mae Taylor, Marvin Ravenel, Juan Dozier, Jessica Ancrum, Samuel Halverson, Lucinda Liferidge and Matthew Shreve
Defendant: Eastwood Construction Partners LLC, Alpha Omega Construction Group Inc, Eastwood Construction LLC, Southcoast Exteriors Inc, Exterior Contract Services LLC and Eastwood Homes Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv04267
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2021 Filing 28 Southcoast's REPLY to Crossclaim #6 of Eastwood by Southcoast Exteriors Inc.(Teague, Carl)
February 6, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint by Southcoast Exteriors Inc.(Teague, Carl)
February 2, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court of Exterior Contract Services, LLC Response filed by Jessica Ancrum, Sherryl Anderson, Brianna Bendik, Randy Brown, Juliann Callery, Juan Dozier, Megan Felkel, Nicole Floyd, Peter Fortner, Kyle Grego, Christian Hallock, Samuel Halverson, Kathleen Harvey, Janica Hunter, Sanchelle Johnson, Ahmad Lewis, Lucinda Liferidge, Jeremy McNeer, Wendi O'Brien, Jason Pogar, Marvin Ravenel, Mary Russo, Jeremy Sheltra, Matthew Shreve, Dolores Smiley, Mae Taylor, Neverrol Thompson, Maria Turner, Lynn Washington, Janelle Wright. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of M. Nolan Webb, #2 Exhibit Spreadsheet of Class Members (Ex. A), #3 Exhibit Class Member Deeds (Ex. B Part 1), #4 Exhibit Class Member Deeds (Ex. B Part 2), #5 Exhibit Class Member Deeds (Ex. B Part 3), #6 Exhibit Class Member Deeds (Ex. B Part 4), #7 Exhibit Class Member Deeds (Ex. B Part 5), #8 Exhibit Class Member Deeds (Ex. B Part 6), #9 Exhibit Class Member Deeds (Ex. B Part 7), #10 Exhibit Class Member Deeds (Ex. B Part 8), #11 Exhibit Class Member Deeds (Ex. B Part 9), #12 Exhibit Class Member Deeds (Ex. B Part 10), #13 Exhibit Property Tax Bills (Ex. C), #14 Exhibit Charleston 4 Percent Application (Ex. D), #15 Exhibit Berkeley 4 Percent Application (Ex. E), #16 Exhibit Voter Registration (Ex. F Part 1), #17 Exhibit Voter Registration (Ex. F Part 2), #18 Exhibit Voter Registration (Ex. F Part 3), #19 Exhibit Voter Registration (Ex. F Part 4), #20 Exhibit Voter Registration (Ex. F Part 5), #21 Exhibit Voter Registration (Ex. F Part 6), #22 Exhibit Voter Registration (Ex. F Part 7), #23 Exhibit Voter Registration (Ex. F Part 8), #24 Exhibit Voter Registration (Ex. F Part 9), #25 Exhibit Voter Registration (Ex. F Part 10), #26 Exhibit Voter Registration (Ex. F Part 11), #27 Exhibit Voter Registration (Ex. F Part 12), #28 Exhibit Voter Registration (Ex. F Part 13), #29 Exhibit Voter Registration (Ex. F Part 14), #30 Exhibit Voter Registration (Ex. F Part 15), #31 Exhibit Voter Registration (Ex. F Part 16), #32 Exhibit Voter Registration (Ex. F Part 17))(Quinn, Frederick)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall have until February 26, 2021 to respond to plaintiffs' amended complaint Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 2/1/2021.(jbry, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Exterior Contract Services LLC. Response to Motion due by 2/12/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Chase, Catherine)
January 26, 2021 Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Replies due by 2/2/2021. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 1/26/2021.(eric, )
January 26, 2021 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Jessica Ancrum, Sherryl Anderson, Brianna Bendik, Randy Brown, Juliann Callery, Juan Dozier, Megan Felkel, Nicole Floyd, Peter Fortner, Kyle Grego, Christian Hallock, Samuel Halverson, Kathleen Harvey, Janica Hunter, Sanchelle Johnson, Ahmad Lewis, Lucinda Liferidge, Jeremy McNeer, Wendi O'Brien, Jason Pogar, Marvin Ravenel, Mary Russo, Jeremy Sheltra, Matthew Shreve, Dolores Smiley, Mae Taylor, Neverrol Thompson, Maria Turner, Lynn Washington, Janelle Wright. Response to Motion due by 2/9/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Quinn, Frederick)
January 26, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING on Motions #4 MOTION to Stay, #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Telephonic Motion Hearing set for Monday, 2/1/2021 at 11:00 AM cancelled and rescheduled to: Telephonic Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, 2/23/2021 at 1:30 PM before Honorable David C Norton. Call-in instructions will be distributed at a later date. (jbry, )
January 25, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF JOINDER re #18 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Catherine Ava Kopiec on behalf of Eastwood Construction Partners LLC, Eastwood Homes Inc (Kopiec, Catherine)
January 22, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Jessica Ancrum, Sherryl Anderson, Brianna Bendik, Randy Brown, Juliann Callery, Juan Dozier, Megan Felkel, Nicole Floyd, Peter Fortner, Kyle Grego, Christian Hallock, Samuel Halverson, Kathleen Harvey, Janica Hunter, Sanchelle Johnson, Ahmad Lewis, Lucinda Liferidge, Jeremy McNeer, Wendi O'Brien, Jason Pogar, Marvin Ravenel, Mary Russo, Jeremy Sheltra, Matthew Shreve, Dolores Smiley, Mae Taylor, Neverrol Thompson, Maria Turner, Lynn Washington, Janelle Wright. (Quinn, Frederick)
January 19, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Exterior Contract Services LLC. Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/26/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Chase, Catherine) Modified on 1/19/2021 to correct filer and edit text (jbry,).
January 19, 2021 Filing 17 Additional Attachments to Main Document #16 Response in Opposition to Motion,. First attachment description: Cover Sheet for Filing Exhibit . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Kevin Hutchins)(Barnes, Robert)
January 15, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Eastwood Construction Partners LLC, Eastwood Homes Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/22/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Smiley Complaint, #2 Exhibit Russo Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Clarke Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Derek Hodgin, PE)(Kopiec, Catherine) Modified on 1/19/2021 to create linkage to #17 Additional Attachments filed 1/19/2021 (jbry, ).
January 7, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Holland Chase on behalf of Exterior Contract Services LLC (Chase, Catherine)
January 5, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dolores Smiley, Juan Dozier, Wendi O'Brien, Randy Brown, Mary Russo, Christian Hallock, Mae Taylor, Matthew Shreve, Sherryl Anderson, Kathleen Harvey, Megan Felkel, Nicole Floyd, Lucinda Liferidge, Kyle Grego, Janica Hunter, Ahmad Lewis, Maria Turner, Samuel Halverson, Lynn Washington, Sanchelle Johnson, Brianna Bendik, Jeremy McNeer, Jeremy Sheltra, Jessica Ancrum, Neverrol Thompson, Jason Pogar, Janelle Wright, Peter Fortner, Marvin Ravenel, Juliann Callery. Alpha Omega Construction Group Inc served on 12/7/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Quinn, Frederick) (Main Document 13 replaced on 1/7/2021) (jbry, ). Modified on 1/7/2021 to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user (jbry, ).
January 5, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dolores Smiley, Juan Dozier, Wendi O'Brien, Randy Brown, Mary Russo, Christian Hallock, Mae Taylor, Matthew Shreve, Sherryl Anderson, Kathleen Harvey, Megan Felkel, Nicole Floyd, Lucinda Liferidge, Kyle Grego, Janica Hunter, Ahmad Lewis, Maria Turner, Samuel Halverson, Lynn Washington, Sanchelle Johnson, Brianna Bendik, Jeremy McNeer, Jeremy Sheltra, Jessica Ancrum, Neverrol Thompson, Jason Pogar, Janelle Wright, Peter Fortner, Marvin Ravenel, Juliann Callery. Southcoast Exteriors Inc served on 12/7/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of John Gamble)(Quinn, Frederick) (Main Document 12 replaced on 1/7/2021) (jbry, ). Modified on 1/7/2021 to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user (jbry, ).
January 5, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dolores Smiley, Juan Dozier, Wendi O'Brien, Randy Brown, Mary Russo, Christian Hallock, Mae Taylor, Matthew Shreve, Sherryl Anderson, Kathleen Harvey, Megan Felkel, Nicole Floyd, Lucinda Liferidge, Kyle Grego, Janica Hunter, Ahmad Lewis, Maria Turner, Samuel Halverson, Lynn Washington, Sanchelle Johnson, Brianna Bendik, Jeremy McNeer, Jeremy Sheltra, Jessica Ancrum, Neverrol Thompson, Jason Pogar, Janelle Wright, Peter Fortner, Marvin Ravenel, Juliann Callery. Exterior Contract Services LLC served on 12/7/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of John Gamble, #2 Exhibit Return Receipts and the Delivery Confirmation Information)(Quinn, Frederick) (Main Document 11 replaced on 1/7/2021) (jbry, ). Modified on 1/7/2021 to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user (jbry, ).
January 5, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motions #4 MOTION to Stay , #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Telephonic Motion Hearing set for Monday, 2/1/2021 at 11:00 AM before Honorable David C Norton. Call-in instructions will be distributed at a later date. (jbry, )
January 4, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jessica Ancrum, Sherryl Anderson, Brianna Bendik, Randy Brown, Juliann Callery, Juan Dozier, Megan Felkel, Nicole Floyd, Peter Fortner, Kyle Grego, Christian Hallock, Samuel Halverson, Kathleen Harvey, Janica Hunter, Sanchelle Johnson, Ahmad Lewis, Lucinda Liferidge, Jeremy McNeer, Wendi O'Brien, Jason Pogar, Marvin Ravenel, Mary Russo, Jeremy Sheltra, Matthew Shreve, Dolores Smiley, Mae Taylor, Neverrol Thompson, Maria Turner, Lynn Washington, Janelle Wright. Response to Motion due by 1/19/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B-3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B-4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B-5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B-6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit B-7, #10 Exhibit Exhibit B-8, #11 Exhibit Exhibit B-9, #12 Exhibit Exhibit B-10, #13 Exhibit Exhibit B-11, #14 Exhibit Exhibit B-12, #15 Exhibit Exhibit B-13, #16 Exhibit Exhibit B-14, #17 Exhibit Exhibit B-15, #18 Exhibit Exhibit B-16, #19 Exhibit Exhibit B-17, #20 Exhibit Exhibit B-18, #21 Exhibit Exhibit B-19, #22 Exhibit Exhibit B-20, #23 Exhibit Exhibit B-21, #24 Exhibit Exhibit B-22, #25 Exhibit Exhibit B-23, #26 Exhibit Exhibit B-24, #27 Exhibit Exhibit B-25, #28 Exhibit Exhibit B-26, #29 Exhibit Exhibit B-27, #30 Exhibit Exhibit C, #31 Exhibit Exhibit D, #32 Exhibit Exhibit E, #33 Exhibit Exhibit F, #34 Exhibit Exhibit G, #35 Exhibit Exhibit H)No proposed order.(Quinn, Frederick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2021: #36 Descriptive List of Exhibits) (jbry, ). Modified on 1/4/2021 to add descriptive list of exhibits as provided by the filing user (jbry, ).
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Support re #4 MOTION to Stay Response filed by Eastwood Construction Partners LLC, Eastwood Homes Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Construction Defects Letter from Plaintiff dated 11-30-2020)(Kopiec, Catherine) Modified on 1/4/2021 to add description to exhibit(jbry, ).
December 29, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Stay Response filed by Jessica Ancrum, Sherryl Anderson, Brianna Bendik, Randy Brown, Juliann Callery, Juan Dozier, Megan Felkel, Nicole Floyd, Peter Fortner, Kyle Grego, Christian Hallock, Samuel Halverson, Kathleen Harvey, Janica Hunter, Sanchelle Johnson, Ahmad Lewis, Lucinda Liferidge, Jeremy McNeer, Wendi O'Brien, Jason Pogar, Marvin Ravenel, Mary Russo, Jeremy Sheltra, Matthew Shreve, Dolores Smiley, Mae Taylor, Neverrol Thompson, Maria Turner, Lynn Washington, Janelle Wright.Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/5/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Quinn, Frederick)
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Alpha Omega Construction Group Inc, Exterior Contract Services LLC, Southcoast Exteriors Inc by Eastwood Construction Partners LLC, Eastwood Homes Inc.(Kopiec, Catherine)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION to Stay Response filed by Eastwood Construction Partners LLC, Eastwood Homes Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice to Cure to Eastwood, #3 Exhibit Response to Notice to Cure, #4 Exhibit Amended Summons & Complaint)(Kopiec, Catherine)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay by Eastwood Construction Partners LLC, Eastwood Homes Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Kopiec, Catherine)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Eastwood Construction Partners LLC.(jbry, )
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-10-03794. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9520382), filed by Eastwood Construction Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit Order of Protection)(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russo et al v. Eastwood Construction Partners LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastwood Construction Partners LLC
Represented By: Catherine Ava Kopiec
Represented By: Robert Bryan Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Omega Construction Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastwood Construction LLC
Represented By: Catherine Ava Kopiec
Represented By: Robert Bryan Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southcoast Exteriors Inc
Represented By: Carl Reed Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exterior Contract Services LLC
Represented By: Chandler D Rowh
Represented By: Catherine Holland Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastwood Homes Inc
Represented By: Catherine Ava Kopiec
Represented By: Robert Bryan Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Smiley
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Pogar
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Harvey
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliann Callery
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Sheltra
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Turner
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Fortner
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Felkel
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Bendik
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Grego
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmad Lewis
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Floyd
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Russo
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Washington
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Brown
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy McNeer
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neverrol Thompson
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanchelle Johnson
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendi O'Brien
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherryl Anderson
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janelle Wright
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Hallock
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janica Hunter
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mae Taylor
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Ravenel
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Dozier
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Ancrum
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Halverson
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucinda Liferidge
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Shreve
Represented By: Frederick Elliotte Quinn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?