Teague et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Maurice Allen Teague and Mary V Teague
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc, Honeywell International Inc, TWC The Valve Company LLC, Elliott Company, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Uniroyal Inc, Grinnell LLC, Copes-Vulcan Inc, Gardner Denver Inc, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, J R Clarkson Holdings, Inc, The, Bayer Cropscience Inc, Walworth Company, The, Allied, John Crane Inc, A W Chesterton Company, IMO Industries Inc, Chapman Valve Manufacturing Company, Viacom Inc, William Powell Company, The, Carborundum Company, The, Carrier Corporation, Warren Pumps Inc, Foster Wheeler Energy Coporation, Goulds Pumps LLC, Allied-Signal Inc, Crane Co, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Elliott Turbomachinery Company Inc A Delaware Corporation, Greene Tweed & Company Inc, Fmc Corporation, General Electric Company, Riley Power Inc, Nash Engineering Company, The, Union Carbide Corporation and Spirax Sarco Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00113
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Filing 74 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mary V Teague, Maurice Allen Teague Without Prejudice (Swett, William)
March 9, 2021 Filing 73 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ViacomCBS Inc. (Techman, Jennifer)
March 9, 2021 Filing 72 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by ViacomCBS Inc.(Techman, Jennifer)
March 9, 2021 Filing 71 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ViacomCBS Inc.(Techman, Jennifer)
March 9, 2021 Filing 70 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Goulds Pumps LLC.(Meriwether, Robert)
March 9, 2021 Filing 69 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Greene Tweed & Company Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
March 9, 2021 Filing 68 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Greene Tweed & Company Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
March 8, 2021 Filing 66 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Carrier Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
March 8, 2021 Filing 65 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Carrier Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
March 5, 2021 Filing 64 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Crane Co.(Sullivan, Tara)
March 5, 2021 Filing 63 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Crane Co.(Sullivan, Tara)
March 3, 2021 Filing 61 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 49 Reason: Document is a verification which should have been filed as an attachment to ECF #35 rather than as a main document. Clerk deleted the entry, then attached the document to #35 per the filer's request. (vdru, )
March 2, 2021 Filing 60 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Warren Pumps Inc.(Cherry, Nicolas)
March 2, 2021 Filing 59 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Warren Pumps Inc.(Cherry, Nicolas)
March 1, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E Frick on behalf of Bayer Cropscience Inc, Fmc Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation (Frick, Scott)
March 1, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Moffatt Grier McDonald on behalf of Bayer Cropscience Inc, Fmc Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation (McDonald, Moffatt)
March 1, 2021 Filing 56 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Union Carbide Corporation.(Conner, William)
March 1, 2021 Filing 55 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation.(Conner, William)
March 1, 2021 Filing 54 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Fmc Corporation.(Conner, William)
March 1, 2021 Filing 53 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Fmc Corporation.(Conner, William)
March 1, 2021 Filing 52 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bayer Cropscience Inc.(Conner, William)
March 1, 2021 Filing 51 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bayer Cropscience Inc.(Conner, William)
March 1, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by William David Conner on behalf of Bayer Cropscience Inc, Fmc Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation (Conner, William)
February 25, 2021 Filing 49 John Crane Inc-Verification of Local Rule 26.01 AFFIDAVIT of Records Custodian John Crane Inc-Verification of Local Rule 26.01 by John Crane Inc.(Elliott, James)
February 23, 2021 Filing 46 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Elliott Company.(Meriwether, Robert)
February 23, 2021 Filing 45 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Honeywell International Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
February 23, 2021 Filing 44 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
February 23, 2021 Filing 43 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Elliott Company.(Meriwether, Robert)
February 23, 2021 Filing 42 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
February 22, 2021 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A W Chesterton Company. (Techman, Jennifer)
February 22, 2021 Filing 40 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by A W Chesterton Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
February 22, 2021 Filing 39 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by A W Chesterton Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
February 19, 2021 Filing 37 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by TWC The Valve Company LLC. (Meriwether, Robert)
February 19, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Christine White on behalf of John Crane Inc (White, Megan)
February 19, 2021 Filing 35 John Crane Inc.'s Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by John Crane Inc.(Elliott, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/3/2021: #1 John Crane Inc-Verification of Local Rule 26.01) (vdru, ). Modified on 3/3/2021 to add attachment originally filed as ECF #49 by filer. (vdru, ).
February 19, 2021 Filing 34 John Crane Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint by John Crane Inc.(Elliott, James)
February 18, 2021 Filing 32 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gardner Denver Inc.(Cherry, Nicolas)
February 18, 2021 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gardner Denver Inc.(Cherry, Nicolas)
February 18, 2021 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Techman, Jennifer)
February 18, 2021 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler Energy Coporation. (Techman, Jennifer)
February 18, 2021 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Spirax Sarco Inc. (Techman, Jennifer)
February 18, 2021 Filing 27 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Spirax Sarco Inc.(Techman, Jennifer)
February 18, 2021 Filing 26 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by General Electric Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
February 18, 2021 Filing 25 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Foster Wheeler Energy Coporation.(Techman, Jennifer)
February 18, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Foster Wheeler Energy Coporation.(Techman, Jennifer)
February 18, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by General Electric Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
February 18, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Spirax Sarco Inc.(Techman, Jennifer)
February 18, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by James B Glenn on behalf of Goulds Pumps LLC, Grinnell LLC, Honeywell International Inc, TWC The Valve Company LLC, William Powell Company, The (Glenn, James)
February 17, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by G Mark Phillips on behalf of Honeywell International Inc, William Powell Company, The (Phillips, G)
February 17, 2021 Filing 19 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by TWC The Valve Company LLC.(Meriwether, Robert)
February 17, 2021 Filing 18 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Uniroyal Inc.(Davis, Donald)
February 17, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Uniroyal Inc.(Davis, Donald)
February 17, 2021 Filing 16 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Grinnell LLC.(Meriwether, Robert)
February 17, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Jay Davis, Jr on behalf of Uniroyal Inc (Davis, Donald)
February 17, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by William Powell Company, The.(Meriwether, Robert)
February 17, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by TWC The Valve Company LLC.(Meriwether, Robert)
February 17, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Honeywell International Inc.(Meriwether, Robert)
February 17, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Grinnell LLC.(Meriwether, Robert)
February 17, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Goulds Pumps LLC.(Meriwether, Robert)
February 16, 2021 Filing 9 Riley Power's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Riley Power Inc.(Early, William)
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Riley Power Inc. (Early, William)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 Riley Power's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Riley Power Inc.(Early, William)
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Wall, Mark)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William P Early on behalf of Riley Power Inc (Early, William)
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (vdru, )
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mary V Teague, Maurice Allen Teague.(vdru, )
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9581932.), filed by Maurice Allen Teague, Mary V Teague. Service due by 4/12/2021.(vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teague et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWC The Valve Company LLC
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal Inc
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Represented By: Matthew Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copes-Vulcan Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver Inc
Represented By: Stephanie G Flynn
Represented By: Allyson Rebecca Twilley
Represented By: Nicolas John Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J R Clarkson Holdings, Inc, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience Inc
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Represented By: Moffatt Grier McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walworth Company, The
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc
Represented By: James H Elliott, Jr
Represented By: Megan Christine White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A W Chesterton Company
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapman Valve Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company, The
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carborundum Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps Inc
Represented By: Stephanie G Flynn
Represented By: Allyson Rebecca Twilley
Represented By: Nicolas John Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Coporation
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied-Signal Inc
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co
Represented By: Tara Cloer Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance
Represented By: Mark Hedderman Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Turbomachinery Company Inc A Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Represented By: James B Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene Tweed & Company Inc
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fmc Corporation
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Represented By: Moffatt Grier McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power Inc
Represented By: William P Early
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nash Engineering Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Represented By: Moffatt Grier McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco Inc
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Allen Teague
Represented By: William Christopher Swett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary V Teague
Represented By: William Christopher Swett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?