A+ Auto Service LLC v. Republic Services of South Carolina LLC
Plaintiff: A+ Auto Service LLC
Defendant: Republic Services of South Carolina LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01492
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Republic Services of South Carolina LLC. Response to Motion due by 7/21/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Customer Service Agreement, #2 Exhibit Invoice)No proposed order.(Tierney, Joseph)
June 28, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER re #5 . Defendant filed a motion to dismiss the complaint pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and the Court gave Plaintiff leave either to file an amended complaint or respond in opposition. (Dkt. No. 6.) Plaintiff has filed an amended complaint. (Dkt. No. 9.) Therefore, Defendant's motion to dismiss the original complaint #5 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as moot. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/28/21.(sshe, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION against Republic Services of South Carolina LLC, filed by A Auto Service LLC. Service due by 9/21/2021 (Duffy, Brian)
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C Duffy on behalf of A Auto Service LLC (Duffy, Brian)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file either an amended complaint or a response to the instant motion to dismiss on or before June 23, 2021.AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/14/21. (ltap, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Republic Services of South Carolina LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/25/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Customer Service Agreement, #2 Exhibit Invoice)No proposed order.(Tierney, Joseph)
June 2, 2021 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by A Auto Service LLC.(Drescher, David)
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Republic Services of South Carolina LLC.(sshe, )
May 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-10-01714. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9856006), filed by Republic Services of South Carolina LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Declaration of Eileen Schuler)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A+ Auto Service LLC v. Republic Services of South Carolina LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Services of South Carolina LLC
Represented By: Joseph J Tierney
Represented By: Joseph J Tierney, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A+ Auto Service LLC
Represented By: David Scott Drescher
Represented By: John Phillips Linton
Represented By: Patrick Coleman Wooten
Represented By: Brian C Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?