Seabreeze Marina LLC v. VanBogart et al
Plaintiff: Seabreeze Marina LLC
Defendant: Justin VanBogart, Last Toy, Little Bull, Mascota and Pirate's Life
Case Number: 2:2021cv01748
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Marine Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Order Approving Sale. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 07/28/2021.(hcor, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Order Approving Sale M/Y MASCOTA, M/Y LAST TOY, M/Y PIRATES LIFE and M/Y LITTLE BULL, by Seabreeze Marina LLC. Response to Motion due by 8/5/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Support of Sale, #2 Affidavit Exhibit 1 Shuler, #3 Affidavit Exhibit 2 Gregory)No proposed order.(Bluestein, S)
July 22, 2021 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Post and Courier by Seabreeze Marina LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Newspaper Ad)(Bluestein, S)
July 6, 2021 Filing 22 USM 285 RETURN OF SERVICE by Seabreeze Marina LLC re #13 Warrant In Rem Issued, #14 Warrant In Rem Issued, #16 Warrant In Rem Issued, #15 Warrant In Rem Issued (jbry, )
July 1, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seabreeze Marina LLC. Pirate's Life served on 6/14/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Bluestein, S)
July 1, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seabreeze Marina LLC. Last Toy served on 6/14/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Bluestein, S)
July 1, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seabreeze Marina LLC. Mascota served on 6/14/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Bluestein, S)
July 1, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seabreeze Marina LLC. Little Bull served on 6/14/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Bluestein, S)
July 1, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seabreeze Marina LLC. Justin VanBogart served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. (Bluestein, S)
June 14, 2021 Filing 16 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM ISSUED for M/Y Little Bull (jbry, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 15 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM ISSUED for M/Y Pirate's Life (jbry, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 14 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM ISSUED for M/Y Last Toy (jbry, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 13 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM ISSUED for M/Y Mascota (jbry, )
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Publication Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/14/2021.(jbry, )
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Allow Vessels to Move Within Port Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/14/2021.(jbry, )
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appoint Custodian Seabreeze Marina LLC appointed Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/14/2021.(jbry, )
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/14/2021.(jbry, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Publication by Seabreeze Marina LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/25/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Newspaper Ad, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bluestein, S)
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION Allow Vessel to Move and Continue Cargo Operations by Seabreeze Marina LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/25/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bluestein, S)
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Custodian by Seabreeze Marina LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/25/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Statement, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bluestein, S)
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Seabreeze Marina LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/25/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Warrant of Arrest, #2 Supporting Documents Warrant of Arrest, #3 Supporting Documents Warrant of Arrest, #4 Supporting Documents Warrant of Arrest)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bluestein, S)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Justin Vanbogart. (jbry, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Seabreeze Marina LLC.(jbry, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9898498.), filed by Seabreeze Marina LLC. Service due by 9/8/2021(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seabreeze Marina LLC v. VanBogart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin VanBogart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Last Toy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Bull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mascota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pirate's Life
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seabreeze Marina LLC
Represented By: S Scott Bluestein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?