Hawaii Discount LLC v. Hawaii Sunset Events LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hawaii Discount LLC doing business as Hawaiidiscount.com LLC
Defendant: Hawaii Sunset Events LLC doing business as Chief's Luau, Teuila Hawaii LLC and Robert's Hawaii, LLC
Counter Defendant: Hawaii Discount LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv02011
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Filing 11 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/13/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/8/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 11/8/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/10/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/14/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/15/2022, Discovery due by 6/6/2022, Motions in Limine due at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 6/20/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 8/1/2022, ADR Statement due by 7/1/2022, Mediation Due by 7/31/2022, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 9/1/2021. (jbry, )
August 18, 2021 Filing 10 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim #8 by Hawaii Discount LLC.(Haller, David)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard S Klosowski, Jr on behalf of Hawaii Discount LLC (Klosowski, Bernard)
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Hawaii Discount LLC by Teuila Hawaii LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement Between Chief's Luau and Hawaii Discount, #2 Exhibit B - 2013.06.03 Email fr John Fradella to Eddie Sax)(Abney, Merritt)
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Hawaii Discount LLC. Service due by 10/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 2012 Agreement , #3 Exhibit 1a - 2012 Agreement, #4 Exhibit 1b - 2012 Agreement, #5 Exhibits 2 and 3 - 2013 Agreement with Hawaii Discount and 2013 Agreement with Hawaii Discount and Hashtag Media, #6 Exhibit 4 - Email chain dated June 3, 2013, #7 Exhibit 5 - Composite Exhibit with July 12, 2021 emails, #8 Exhibit 6 - Letter dated July 23, 2021) (Haller, David) Modified docket text to add descriptions of exhibits per filing user's exhibit list on 8/17/2021 (hcor, ).
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Teuila Hawaii LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement Between Chief's Luau and Hawaii Discount)(Abney, Merritt)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Charleston County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acknowledgment of Notice of Removal and Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Abney, Merritt)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Teuila Hawaii LLC.(jbry, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-10-02808. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9942628), filed by Teuila Hawaii LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B- HSE Articles of Termination)(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawaii Discount LLC v. Hawaii Sunset Events LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Discount LLC doing business as Hawaiidiscount.com LLC
Represented By: David K Haller
Represented By: Bernard S Klosowski, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Sunset Events LLC doing business as Chief's Luau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teuila Hawaii LLC
Represented By: John C McElwaine
Represented By: Merritt G Abney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert's Hawaii, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Hawaii Discount LLC
Represented By: Bernard S Klosowski, Jr
Represented By: David K Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?