Oppenheimer v. Liberatos et al
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Defendant: John Liberatos, Kory Roscoe, Jane Martin, Charleston Property Group, LLC, The Boulevard Company and BOULEVARD, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv02198
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 17 Letter from John Liberatos, Kory Roscoe, and the Boulevard Realty Company, LLC. (Cobb, Hal)
September 14, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott Michael Francis ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-10072161) by David Oppenheimer. Response to Motion due by 9/28/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application Pro Hac Vice Scott Francis, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing for Scott Francis, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Allen, Samuel)
September 14, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dana A. LeJune ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-10072131) by David Oppenheimer. Response to Motion due by 9/28/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application Pro Hac Vice Dana A. LeJune, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing for Dana A. LeJune, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Allen, Samuel)
September 14, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Oppenheimer Charleston Property Group, LLC (Allen, Samuel)
September 13, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BOULEVARD, LLC, CHARLESTON PROPERTY GROUP, LLC, filed by David Oppenheimer. Service due by 12/13/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit THE WORK, #2 Exhibit Cert. of Reg., #3 Exhibit Infringements, #4 Exhibit C&D Letter) (Allen, Samuel)
September 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Oppenheimer Jane Martin (Allen, Samuel)
August 27, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Hal Eugene Cobb on behalf of John Liberatos, Kory Roscoe, The Boulevard Company (Cobb, Hal)
August 27, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by John Liberatos, Kory Roscoe, The Boulevard Company. Response to Motion due by 9/10/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Huffer, Stefanie)
August 25, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Charleston Property Group, LLC answer due 9/16/2021. (Allen, Samuel)
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Jane Martin answer due 9/16/2021. (Allen, Samuel)
August 3, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE by David Oppenheimer. The Boulevard Company waiver executed on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Waiver Boulevard Realty)(Allen, Samuel)
August 3, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE by David Oppenheimer. Kory Roscoe waiver executed on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Waiver Roscoe)(Allen, Samuel)
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE by David Oppenheimer. John Liberatos waiver executed on 7/27/2021, answer due 9/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Waiver Liberatos)(Allen, Samuel)
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by David Oppenheimer.(hcor, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service by David Oppenheimer. (hcor, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charleston Property Group, LLC, John Liberatos, Jane Martin, Kory Roscoe, The Boulevard Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9967965.), filed by David Oppenheimer. Service due by 10/18/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - The Work, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Copyright Registration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Infringements, #4 Exhibit 4 - Cease & Desist Letter)(hcor, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oppenheimer v. Liberatos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Represented By: Samuel K Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Liberatos
Represented By: Hal Eugene Cobb
Represented By: Stefanie L Huffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kory Roscoe
Represented By: Hal Eugene Cobb
Represented By: Stefanie L Huffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charleston Property Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boulevard Company
Represented By: Hal Eugene Cobb
Represented By: Stefanie L Huffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOULEVARD, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?