Southland Renda JV v. Xylem Water Solutions, U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Southland Renda JV
Defendant: Xylem Water Solutions, U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02550
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Xylem Water Solutions, U.S.A., Inc..(Stewart, Nicholas)
September 15, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to Counterclaim #17 by Southland Renda JV.(Kirchner, Jesse)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 Motion by R. Annie Banks to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 9/1/2021.(jbry, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting protection from court appearances to Nickisha Moniece Woodward for 9/23-24/2021, 10/14-15/2021, 10/22/2021, and 11/22-24/2021. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 9/1/2021. (eric, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 21 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/13/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/8/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 11/8/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/10/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/14/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/15/2022, Discovery due by 6/6/2022, Motions in Limine due at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 6/20/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 8/1/2022, ADR Statement due by 7/1/2022, Mediation Due by 7/31/2022, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 9/1/2021. (jbry, )
August 31, 2021 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Southland Renda JV.(Kirchner, Jesse)
August 31, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by R. Annie Banks ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-10048204) by Southland Renda JV. Response to Motion due by 9/14/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Kirchner, Jesse)
August 31, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Nickisha Moniece Woodward for September 23-24, 2021, October 14-15, 2021, October 22, 2021, and November 22-24, 2021 (Woodward, Nickisha)
August 26, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Southland Renda JV by Xylem Water Solutions, U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Purchase Order)(Stewart, Nicholas)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Shaina Swanson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 08/26/2021.(hcor, )
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Allen V. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 08/26/2021.(hcor, )
August 25, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Southland Renda JV by Xylem Water Solutions, U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Purchase Order)(Stewart, Nicholas) (Main Document 14 replaced with corrected certificate of service provided by filing user on 8/26/2021) (hcor, ).
August 24, 2021 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Southland Renda JV.(Kirchner, Jesse)
August 24, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shaina Swanson ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-10036034) by Southland Renda JV. Response to Motion due by 9/7/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Kirchner, Jesse)
August 24, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allen V. Wilson ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-10036015) by Southland Renda JV. Response to Motion due by 9/7/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Kirchner, Jesse)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Xylem Water Solutions, U.S.A., Inc. answer due 8/25/2021. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 08/17/2021.(hcor, )
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for David Gregory Meredith who represents Xylem Water Solutions, U.S.A., Inc. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 08/17/2021.(hcor, )
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Scott D Cessar who represents Xylem Water Solutions, U.S.A., Inc. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 08/17/2021.(hcor, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Xylem Water Solutions, U.S.A., Inc.. Response to Motion due by 8/30/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Consent Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Stewart, Nicholas)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Gregory Meredith ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-10018648) by Xylem Water Solutions, U.S.A., Inc.. Response to Motion due by 8/30/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Stewart, Nicholas)
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott D. Cessar ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-10018593) by Xylem Water Solutions, U.S.A., Inc.. Response to Motion due by 8/30/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Stewart, Nicholas)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 Supplemental Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Xylem Water Solutions, U.S.A., Inc..(Woodward, Nickisha)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Xylem Water Solutions, U.S.A., Inc..(hcor, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021CP1003409. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10008213), filed by Xylem Water Solutions, U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit - State Court Docket page, #3 Exhibit - Notice of Southland Xylem Suits)(hcor, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southland Renda JV v. Xylem Water Solutions, U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southland Renda JV
Represented By: Jesse Allen Kirchner
Represented By: Allen V Wilson
Represented By: R Annie Banks
Represented By: Shaina Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xylem Water Solutions, U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Clarence Chapma Stewart
Represented By: Nickisha Moniece Woodward
Represented By: David Gregory Meredith
Represented By: Scott D Cessar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?