Graham v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Willard Joe Graham
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation, Schneider Electric USA Inc, ViacomCBS Inc, 3M Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Aurora Pump Company, A W Chesterton Company, Bayer Cropscience Inc, Cameron International Corporation, Crane Co, Crosby Valve LLC, Eaton Corporation, Ericsson Inc, FMC Corporation, Gardner Denver Inc, General Electric Company, Carborundum Company, The, John Crane Inc, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Rockwell Automation Inc, Square D Company A Delaware Corporation, Nash Engineering Company, The, Union Carbide Corporation, CBS Corporation (a Delaware Corporation), Viacom Inc (successor by merger to CBS Corporation a Pennsylvania Corporation, Westinghouse Electric Corporation and Warren Pumps Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv02625
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 72 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Industrial Holdings Corporation.(Inabinet, George)
October 1, 2021 Filing 71 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Industrial Holdings Corporation.(Inabinet, George)
September 30, 2021 Filing 70 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Eaton Corporation.(Rawl, A)
September 27, 2021 Filing 68 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Schneider Electric USA Inc.(Laffitte, Jessica)
September 24, 2021 Filing 66 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by 3M Company.(Strickland, Angela)
September 24, 2021 Filing 65 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by 3M Company.(Strickland, Angela)
September 24, 2021 Filing 64 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by 3M Company.(Strickland, Angela)
September 22, 2021 Filing 62 TEXT ORDER re #60 Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance, filed by Schneider Electric USA Inc. Counsel should please know the protection request is duly noted and take under advisement. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 9/22/2021. (sshe, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Willard Joe Graham of Defendant Crosby Valve, LLC (Swett, William)
September 21, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Jessica W Laffitte for October 21, 2021 through January 31, 2022 (Laffitte, Jessica) (Main Document 60 replaced on 9/22/2021) (sshe, ). Modified on 9/22/2021 to replace with corrected document (typo in date) as verified by filing user(sshe, ).
September 21, 2021 Filing 59 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ericsson Inc.(Early, William)
September 21, 2021 Filing 58 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ericsson Inc.(Early, William)
September 17, 2021 Filing 57 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Crane Co.(Sullivan, Tara)
September 17, 2021 Filing 56 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Crane Co.(Sullivan, Tara)
September 17, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E Frick on behalf of Bayer Cropscience Inc (Frick, Scott)
September 17, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Moffatt Grier McDonald on behalf of Bayer Cropscience Inc (McDonald, Moffatt)
September 17, 2021 Filing 53 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bayer Cropscience Inc.(Conner, William)
September 17, 2021 Filing 52 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bayer Cropscience Inc.(Conner, William)
September 17, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by William David Conner on behalf of Bayer Cropscience Inc (Conner, William)
September 15, 2021 Filing 50 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Nash Engineering Company, The.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 14, 2021 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ViacomCBS Inc. (Techman, Jennifer)
September 14, 2021 Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Techman, Jennifer)
September 14, 2021 Filing 46 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by ViacomCBS Inc.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 14, 2021 Filing 45 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by General Electric Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 14, 2021 Filing 44 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ViacomCBS Inc.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 14, 2021 Filing 43 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by General Electric Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 14, 2021 Filing 42 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Cameron International Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 14, 2021 Filing 41 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 14, 2021 Filing 40 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Warren Pumps Inc.(Cherry, Nicolas)
September 14, 2021 Filing 39 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Rockwell Automation Inc.(Cherry, Nicolas)
September 14, 2021 Filing 38 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gardner Denver Inc.(Cherry, Nicolas)
September 14, 2021 Filing 37 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Warren Pumps Inc.(Cherry, Nicolas)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS CROSBY VALVE LLC (DKT. NO. #12 ) AND FMC CORPORATION (DKT. NO. #14 )'s MOTIONS TO DISMISS Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file either an amended complaint or responses to the instant motions on or before September 23, 2021. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 9/13/2021. (sshe, )
September 13, 2021 Filing 34 Eaton Corporation's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Eaton Corporation.(Shofner, Erin)
September 10, 2021 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rockwell Automation Inc.(Cherry, Nicolas)
September 10, 2021 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gardner Denver Inc.(Cherry, Nicolas)
September 10, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by William P Early on behalf of Ericsson Inc (Early, William)
September 10, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E Frick on behalf of FMC Corporation(as Successor in Interest to Northern Pump Company A Massachusetts Corporation), Union Carbide Corporation (Frick, Scott)
September 10, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Moffatt Grier McDonald on behalf of FMC Corporation(as Successor in Interest to Northern Pump Company A Massachusetts Corporation), Union Carbide Corporation (McDonald, Moffatt)
September 10, 2021 Filing 27 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Union Carbide Corporation.(Conner, William)
September 10, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation.(Conner, William)
September 10, 2021 Filing 25 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by FMC Corporation(as Successor in Interest to Northern Pump Company A Massachusetts Corporation).(Conner, William)
September 10, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by FMC Corporation(as Successor in Interest to Northern Pump Company A Massachusetts Corporation).(Conner, William)
September 10, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by William David Conner on behalf of FMC Corporation(as Successor in Interest to Northern Pump Company A Massachusetts Corporation), Union Carbide Corporation (Conner, William)
September 9, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint by Cameron International Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 9, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by Nash Engineering Company, The.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 9, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Meriwether, Robert)
September 9, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by G Mark Phillips on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Cameron International Corporation, Nash Engineering Company, The (Phillips, G)
September 9, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by James B Glenn on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Cameron International Corporation, Nash Engineering Company, The (Glenn, James)
September 9, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert O Meriwether on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Cameron International Corporation, Nash Engineering Company, The (Meriwether, Robert)
September 9, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Schneider Electric USA Inc.(Laffitte, Jessica)
September 9, 2021 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by FMC Corporation(on behalf of its former subsidiary Crosby Valve, LLC A Massachusetts Corporation).(McLeod, Yancey)
September 9, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by FMC Corporation(on behalf of its former subsidiary Crosby Valve, LLC A Massachusetts Corporation). Response to Motion due by 9/23/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(McLeod, Yancey)
September 9, 2021 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Crosby Valve LLC.(McLeod, Yancey)
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Crosby Valve LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/23/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(McLeod, Yancey)
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 9 Reason: Attorney filing user filed incorrect document and duplicate entry Corrected Filing Document Number #7 Filing date is that of original filing: 9/8/2021 (sshe, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Dane Berthelsen on behalf of John Crane Inc (Berthelsen, Cameron)
September 8, 2021 Filing 8 John Crane Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint by John Crane Inc.(Elliott, James)
September 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James H Elliott, Jr on behalf of John Crane Inc (Elliott, James) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/9/2021) (sshe, ). Modified on 9/9/2021 to replace with corrected signature document provided by filing user(sshe, ).
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica W Laffitte on behalf of Schneider Electric USA Inc (Laffitte, Jessica)
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Wall, Mark)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Willard Joe Graham.(sshe, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10018786.), filed by Willard Joe Graham. Service due by 11/15/2021(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Represented By: George L Inabinet, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA Inc
Represented By: Jessica W Laffitte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Angela Gilbert Strickland
Represented By: Anthony Nicholas D'Elia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James B Glenn
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A W Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience Inc
Represented By: Moffatt Grier McDonald
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron International Corporation
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James B Glenn
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co
Represented By: Tara Cloer Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Valve LLC
Represented By: M Elizabeth O'Neill
Represented By: Yancey Alford McLeod, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Erin Elaine Shofner
Represented By: A Victor Rawl, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson Inc
Represented By: William P Early
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: M Elizabeth O'Neill
Represented By: Yancey Alford McLeod, III
Represented By: Moffatt Grier McDonald
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver Inc
Represented By: Allyson Rebecca Twilley
Represented By: Nicolas John Cherry
Represented By: Stephanie G Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carborundum Company, The
Represented By: George L Inabinet, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc
Represented By: Cameron Dane Berthelsen
Represented By: James H Elliott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark Hedderman Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation Inc
Represented By: Allyson Rebecca Twilley
Represented By: Nicolas John Cherry
Represented By: Stephanie G Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square D Company A Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Jessica W Laffitte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nash Engineering Company, The
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James B Glenn
Represented By: Robert O Meriwether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Moffatt Grier McDonald
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation (a Delaware Corporation)
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc (successor by merger to CBS Corporation a Pennsylvania Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps Inc
Represented By: Allyson Rebecca Twilley
Represented By: Nicolas John Cherry
Represented By: Stephanie G Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willard Joe Graham
Represented By: John Eugene Herrick
Represented By: William Christopher Swett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?