Williams v. Homeowners of America Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jared Williams
Defendant: Homeowners of America Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv02977
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDERMotions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/14/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/14/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/14/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/14/2022, Discovery due by 3/14/2022, Motions due by 5/14/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 7/1/2022, ADR Statement due by 3/15/2022, Mediation Due by 4/14/2022. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 11/04/2021. (hcor, )
October 28, 2021 Filing 8 Rule 26(f) Report by Homeowners of America Insurance Company.(Murphy, Christopher)
September 27, 2021 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jared Williams.(Mingledorff, Christopher)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/8/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/22/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 10/22/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/12/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/13/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/12/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/12/2022, Discovery due by 3/14/2022, Motions due by 5/13/2022, Mediation Due by 4/13/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 09/17/2021. (hcor, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Clinton Mingledorff on behalf of Jared Williams (Mingledorff, Christopher)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Homeowners of America Insurance Company. (hcor, )
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Homeowners of America Insurance Company.(hcor, )
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021CP1003534. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10074592), filed by Homeowners of America Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Notice of Filing)(hcor, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Homeowners of America Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Williams
Represented By: Christopher Clinton Mingledorff
Represented By: Jared Cyle Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeowners of America Insurance Company
Represented By: Alicia Noel Bolyard
Represented By: Christopher L Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?