Burris v. Atlatl Software, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Susan Burris
Defendant: Atlatl Software, Inc. and Justin Scott
Case Number: 2:2021cv03277
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 11/30/2021. (kric, )
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting #23 Motion for Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 11/30/2021.(kric, )
November 29, 2021 Filing 24 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Susan Burris.(Mullaney, Marybeth)
November 29, 2021 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Atlatl Software, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 12/13/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Confidentiality Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(McMahon, Michelle)
November 29, 2021 Filing 22 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Atlatl Software, Inc..(McMahon, Michelle)
November 29, 2021 Filing 21 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Atlatl Software, Inc., Justin Scott, and Susan Burris.(McMahon, Michelle) Modified on 11/30/2021 to edit filers and text (kric, ).
November 29, 2021 Filing 20 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Atlatl Software, Inc., Justin SCott and Susan Burris.(McMahon, Michelle) Modified on 11/30/2021 to edit filers and text (kric, ).
November 23, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2021 10:30 AM in Columbia # 6, Matthew J. Perry, Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald. (kric, )
November 15, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Atlatl Software, Inc.. (McMahon, Michelle)
November 10, 2021 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Susan Burris.(Mullaney, Marybeth)
November 6, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Susan Burris.Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/15/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Mullaney, Marybeth)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 the plaintiff's consent motion for extension of time until November 5, 2021, to file a response to the pending partial motion to dismiss #9 . IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 10/28/21. (rweb, )
October 28, 2021 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Susan Burris. Response to Motion due by 11/12/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Mullaney, Marybeth)
October 21, 2021 Filing 10 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 4/18/2022, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/21/2022. (kric, )
October 21, 2021 Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 11/12/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/29/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 11/29/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/16/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/18/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/17/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/17/2022, Discovery due by 4/18/2022, Motions due by 5/18/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 8/16/2022, Mediation Due by 4/18/2022, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/21/2021. (kric, )
October 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Atlatl Software, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 10/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memorandum in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(McMahon, Michelle)
October 15, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Atlatl Software, Inc., Justin Scott.(McMahon, Michelle)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE PLAINTIFF HAS 14-DAYS TO FILE 26.01 INTERROGATORIES. (sgri)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Atlatl Software, Inc., Justin Scott. (sgri)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas County of Charleston, South Carolina case number 2021-CP-10-03860. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10116239), filed by Justin Scott, Atlatl Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (sgri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burris v. Atlatl Software, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Burris
Represented By: Marybeth E Mullaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlatl Software, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin P Glass
Represented By: Michelle Elsey McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Scott
Represented By: Benjamin P Glass
Represented By: Michelle Elsey McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?