McNeal v. Hutchinson et al
Plaintiff: Timothy McNeal
Defendant: Ms. J. Hutchinson, Mr. C. Nevils, Mr. Glenn, Ms. Lanham, Ms. Necomb, Mr. Moore, Mr. Taylor, Ms. Johnson and Ms. V. Martin
Case Number: 2:2021cv03431
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 20 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #17 Order, from Charleston Clerks Office to Timothy McNeal 95525-020 EDGEFIELD C-4 FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 725 EDGEFIELD, SC 29824. Summons form 16 issued, and copies of #17 along with copies [1, 1-1], the summons form, and Forms USM-285 for service of process on Defendant Martin. (dgar)
December 17, 2021 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Ms. V. Martin. Service due by 3/17/2022. (dgar)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The undersigned directs the Clerk of Court to substitute "Ms. V. Martin" for Defendant Moore on the Court's Electronic Case Filing system. All references to Defendant Moore in Plaintiff's Complaint shall hereby be construed as referencing Defendant V. Martin. The Clerk of Court is further directed to issue the summons form 16 , and to forward copies of this Order, the Complaint (and its attachments) [1, 1-1], the summons form, and the Form USM-285 16 for service of process on Defendant Martin. The Clerk of Court shall calculate the 90-day period for service of process under Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure from the date on which the summons is issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 12/17/2021. (dgar)
December 17, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE re #11 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dgar)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REFERENCE ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 12/1/2021.(dgar)
December 1, 2021 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #11 Order 1983, #12 Summons Issued, blank summons form, reference order, and USM 285 Form, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Timothy McNeal 95525-020 EDGEFIELD C-4 FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 725 EDGEFIELD, SC 29824. Copy of Order, #1 , summons forms, USM-285 forms on Defendants Hutchinson, Nevils, Glenn, Lanham, Necomb, Taylor, and Johnson placed in U.S. Marshalls box. (dgar) Modified on 12/1/2021 to include ref. order (dgar).
December 1, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Glenn, J. Hutchinson, Johnson, Lanham, Necomb, C. Nevils, Taylor. Service due by 3/1/2022. (dgar) (Main Document 12 replaced on 12/1/2021) (dgar, ). (Main Document 12 replaced on 12/6/2021) (dgar, ).
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER authorizing service of process and collection of filing fee. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00. Apprising the defendants of deadline for filing dispositive motions and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 12/1/2021. (dgar)
November 29, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Timothy McNeal. Response to Motion due by 12/13/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(dgar)
November 9, 2021 Filing 8 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRIES #2, #3, and #4. Reason: duplicate entries. (rshu, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #5 Proper Form Order and required documents placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerk's Office to Timothy McNeal 95525-020, EDGEFIELD FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. BOX 725, EDGEFIELD, SC 29824. (rshu, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 11/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 11/8/21. (rshu, )
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mr. Glenn, Ms. Hutchinson, Ms.Johnson, Ms. Lanham, Ms. Moore, Ms. Necomb, Mr. C. Nevils, and Mr. Taylor, filed by TIMOTHY MCNEAL. Service due by 1/24/2022 (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Attachments, #2 Envelope)(dgar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeal v. Hutchinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy McNeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. J. Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. C. Nevils
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Lanham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Necomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. V. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?