Bruce v. Equifax Information Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nelson L. Bruce
Defendant: Equifax Information Solutions, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TransUnion, LLC and Unknown Does 1-100
Case Number: 2:2021cv03603
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Filing 24 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 23 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Nelson L. Bruce PO BOX 3345 Summerville, SC 29484-3345. (dgar)
December 29, 2021 Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 1/27/2022. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 12/29/2021.(kman, )
December 28, 2021 Filing 22 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Bryant, Lyndey)
December 28, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 1/11/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Bryant, Lyndey)
December 27, 2021 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Solutions, LLC. (Barker, Rita)
December 27, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Solutions, LLC.(Barker, Rita)
December 27, 2021 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 17 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Nelson L. Bruce PO BOX 3345 Summerville, SC 29484-3345. (dgar)
December 27, 2021 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. TransUnion, LLC answer due 1/27/2022. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 12/27/2021.(kman, )
December 23, 2021 Filing 16 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by TransUnion, LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
December 23, 2021 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by TransUnion, LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/6/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Johnson, Wilbur)
December 15, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nelson L. Bruce. Equifax Information Solutions, LLC served on 12/6/2021, answer due 12/29/2021; Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 12/7/2021, answer due 12/29/2021; TransUnion, LLC served on 12/6/2021, answer due 12/29/2021. (dgar)
November 19, 2021 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Nelson L. Bruce. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dgar)
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Solutions, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., and TransUnion, LLC. Service due by 2/14/2022 (rshu, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Order Service - Non-Inmate, 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerk's Office to Nelson L. Bruce, PO BOX 3345, Summerville, SC 29484-3345. (rshu, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REFERENCE #7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 11/8/21. (rshu, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 11/8/21. (rshu, )
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) from Nelson L. Bruce. Response to Motion due by 11/16/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(dgar)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Solutions, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, Unknown Does 1-100, filed by Nelson L. Bruce. Service due by 1/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet #2 Envelope)(dgar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce v. Equifax Information Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson L. Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Rita Bolt Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Lyndey Ritz Zwing Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Wilbur Eugene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?