Molina-Figueroa v. Warden Mackleberg
Petitioner: Carlos Estaban Molina-Figueroa
Respondent: Warden Mackleberg and Warden, F.C.I. Edgefield
Case Number: 2:2021cv03681
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Joseph Dawson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re #3 Order 2241 Federal Habeas, 5 Document Mailed. Unsigned/Undated. (dgar)
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re #3 Order 2241 Federal Habeas, 5 Document Mailed, served on Warden of Edgefield FCI (dgar)
December 14, 2021 Filing 5 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #3 Order 2241 Federal Habeas. Copy of #1 and [1-1] Mailed to Respondent, along with copies sent certified to Attorney General of United States, and placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Carlos Estaban Molina-Figueroa 19901-081 FCI Edgefield PO Box 725 Edgefield, SC 29824. (dgar)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk. Apprising the respondent of deadline of 3/2/2022 for filing dispositive motions and directing petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 12/14/2021. (dgar) Modified on 12/15/2021 to include deadline(dgar).
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 Receipt number scx400015371.), filed by Carlos Estaban Molina-Figueroa. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(cpeg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molina-Figueroa v. Warden Mackleberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carlos Estaban Molina-Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Mackleberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, F.C.I. Edgefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?