Arkema v. Sims
Plaintiff: Taylor Tate Arkema
Defendant: Cristal Irene Sims
Not Classified By Court: Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv03853
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2023 Filing 49 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Taylor Tate Arkema. (Whitley, Joshua)
May 2, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearings: Pretrial conference set for 5/1/2023 and Jury Selection set for 5/2/2023. (vdru, )
April 26, 2023 Filing 47 Counsel for Progressive Gulf Insurance Company hereby certifies that the juror information forms and the information obtained therefrom are privileged and shall be kept confidential and not shared with anyone other than his or her client or other members of his or her law firm, US Attorney or Federal Defender organization without written consent of the United States District Court. This information shall be used solely for evaluation of potential jurors for service in this case and shall not use juror information for any other purpose. Further, counsel certifies that immediately after trial, he or she will destroy all copies, whether paper or electronic, of completed juror questionnaires, juror lists, and any other documents containing information obtained from the completed forms. Failure to adhere to the above requirements would be in violation of 28 U.S.C. 1867(f) and the District of South Carolina's Amended Jury Selection Plan Order.. (Crudup, Jeffrey)
April 25, 2023 Filing 46 Counsel for Taylor Tate Arkema hereby certifies that the juror information forms and the information obtained therefrom are privileged and shall be kept confidential and not shared with anyone other than his or her client or other members of his or her law firm, US Attorney or Federal Defender organization without written consent of the United States District Court. This information shall be used solely for evaluation of potential jurors for service in this case and shall not use juror information for any other purpose. Further, counsel certifies that immediately after trial, he or she will destroy all copies, whether paper or electronic, of completed juror questionnaires, juror lists, and any other documents containing information obtained from the completed forms. Failure to adhere to the above requirements would be in violation of 28 U.S.C. 1867(f) and the District of South Carolina's Amended Jury Selection Plan Order.. (Whitley, Joshua)
April 25, 2023 Filing 45 INITIAL NOTIFICATION OF ELECTRONIC AVAILABILITY OF JUROR QUESTIONNAIRES. In order to obtain access to the attached juror questionnaires, you must docket CERTIFICATION FOR JUROR QUESTIONNAIRES. ***NOTE: FOR CERTIFICATIONS FOR JUROR QUESTIONNAIRES FILED AFTER 4:30 PM, ACCESS WILL BE GRANTED AFTER 8:30 AM THE FOLLOWING BUSINESS DAY***. (kale, )
April 25, 2023 Filing 44 JUROR QUESTIONNAIRES re: Panel Number: 292. Jury Selection held on: 5/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Juror Questionnaires Received by Mail, #2 Alphabetical Juror List, #3 Numerical Struck Juror List)(kale, )
April 25, 2023 Filing 43 Counsel for Cristal Irene Sims hereby certifies that the juror information forms and the information obtained therefrom are privileged and shall be kept confidential and not shared with anyone other than his or her client or other members of his or her law firm, US Attorney or Federal Defender organization without written consent of the United States District Court. This information shall be used solely for evaluation of potential jurors for service in this case and shall not use juror information for any other purpose. Further, counsel certifies that immediately after trial, he or she will destroy all copies, whether paper or electronic, of completed juror questionnaires, juror lists, and any other documents containing information obtained from the completed forms. Failure to adhere to the above requirements would be in violation of 28 U.S.C. 1867(f) and the District of South Carolina's Amended Jury Selection Plan Order.. (McDonald, John)
April 3, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING: Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2023 at 10:00 AM CANCELLED AND RESCHEDULED to 5/1/2023 at 1:00 PM in Charleston Courtroom #2, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks. (gray) (gray, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2023: #1 Standing Order) (gray, ). (Main Document 42 replaced on 4/28/2023) (gray, ).
March 29, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2023 at 10:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #2, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks. (gray)
March 13, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection set for 5/2/2023 at 09:00 AM with Jury Trial starting 5/3/2023 at 9:30 AM, lasting approximately until 5/5/2023 in Charleston Courtroom #2, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks. (gray)
October 12, 2022 Filing 37 Walgreens AFFIDAVIT of Records Custodian Walgreens by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company.(Crudup, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2022 Filing 36 Roper St. Francis Healthcare AFFIDAVIT of Records Custodian Roper St. Francis Healthcare by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company.(Crudup, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2022 Filing 35 Physical Therapy Solutions AFFIDAVIT of Records Custodian Physical Therapy Solutions by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company.(Crudup, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2022 Filing 34 OrthoVirginia AFFIDAVIT of Records Custodian OrthoVirginia by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company.(Crudup, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2022 Filing 33 MUSC AFFIDAVIT of Records Custodian MUSC by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company.(Crudup, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2022 Filing 32 McLean Surgery Center AFFIDAVIT of Records Custodian McLean Surgery Center by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company.(Crudup, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2022 Filing 31 Foot & Ankle Specialists AFFIDAVIT of Records Custodian Foot & Ankle Specialists by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company.(Crudup, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2022 Filing 30 CVS Pharmacy AFFIDAVIT of Records Custodian CVS Pharmacy by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company.(Crudup, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2022 Filing 29 THIRD AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Discovery due by 12/13/2022, Motions due by 1/11/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 04/05/2023, Mediation Due by 12/13/2022. (Motions terminated: #28 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order filed by Taylor Tate Arkema). Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/07/2022. **NOTE: Proposed amended order has been edited. (hcor, ) (Main Document 29 replaced with corrected deadelines on 10/11/2022) (hcor, ).
October 6, 2022 Filing 28 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Taylor Tate Arkema. Response to Motion due by 10/20/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Third Amended Consent Scheduling Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Maples, Allie)
August 4, 2022 Filing 25 SECOND AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/11/2022, Motions due by 11/10/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 2/8/2023, Mediation Due by 10/11/2022, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/4/2022. (adic, )
August 4, 2022 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Taylor Tate Arkema. Response to Motion due by 8/18/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Second Amended Scheduling Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Whitley, Joshua)
July 20, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Allie Aleece Maples on behalf of Taylor Tate Arkema (Maples, Allie)
June 13, 2022 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Record Custodians by Taylor Tate Arkema. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Foot & Ankle Bills, #2 Affidavit McLean Bills, #3 Affidavit OrthoVA Bills, #4 Affidavit PT Solutions Bills, #5 Affidavit Roper Bills, #6 Affidavit Roper Radiologists, #7 Affidavit Washington Nerve Bills, #8 Affidavit Foot & Ankle Spec Records, #9 Affidavit McLean Records, #10 Affidavit OrthoVa Records, #11 Affidavit PT Solutions Records, #12 Affidavit Tuck Ortho)(Whitley, Joshua)
May 10, 2022 Filing 21 PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Taylor Tate Arkema.(Whitley, Joshua)
February 23, 2022 Filing 20 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Cristal Irene Sims.(McDonald, John)
February 17, 2022 Filing 19 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company.(Crudup, Jeffrey)
February 1, 2022 Filing 18 CONSENT AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/3/2022, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/17/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 2/17/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/10/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/11/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/11/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/11/2022, Discovery due by 8/11/2022, Motions due by 9/10/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 12/8/2022, Mediation Due by 8/11/2022. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 2/1/2022. (adic, )
February 1, 2022 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Taylor Tate Arkema.(Whitley, Joshua)
February 1, 2022 Filing 16 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Taylor Tate Arkema. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amended Consent Scheduling Order)(Whitley, Joshua)
January 27, 2022 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Joseph L. Cantor, who represents Taylor Tate Arkema, is granted admission pro hac vice in this case. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 1/27/2022.(vdru, )
January 26, 2022 Filing 14 Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph Cantor ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-10301162) by Taylor Tate Arkema. Response to Motion due by 2/9/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for Pro Hac, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Supporting Documents Proposed Order re Pro Hac)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Whitley, Joshua)
January 13, 2022 Filing 13 MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 7/11/2022. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 1/13/2022. (vdru, )
January 13, 2022 Filing 12 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/3/2022, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/17/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 2/17/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/10/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/11/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/11/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/11/2022, Discovery due by 7/11/2022, Motions due by 8/10/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 11/8/2022, Mediation Due by 7/11/2022. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 1/13/2022. (vdru, )
January 5, 2022 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Cristal Irene Sims.(McDonald, John)
January 5, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cristal Irene Sims.(McDonald, John)
December 30, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taylor Tate Arkema. Cristal Irene Sims served on 12/22/2021, answer due 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents re Sims service)(Whitley, Joshua)
December 27, 2021 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. Attachment from entry #7 removed and filed separately with correct event by Clerk.(vdru, )
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 Progressive Gulf Insurance Company ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Crudup, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/28/2021 to remove attachment and file separately as entry #8. (vdru, ).
December 13, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed re: Progressive Acknowledgement filed by Taylor Tate Arkema. (Whitley, Joshua)
November 29, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cristal Irene Sims. (adic, )
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Taylor Tate Arkema. (adic, )
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cristal Irene Sims ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BSCDC-10203961), filed by Taylor Tate Arkema. Service due by 2/28/2022 (adic, ). Modified on 11/30/2021 made correction to case No. (adic, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arkema v. Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Tate Arkema
Represented By: Joshua S Whitley
Represented By: Joseph Lawrence Cantor
Represented By: Allie Aleece Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cristal Irene Sims
Represented By: John L McDonald, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Crudup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?