Gaston v. State of Alaska
Plaintiff: Barbara Gaston
Defendant: State of Alaska
3Rd Party Defendant: 3M Company, EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Dupont De Nemours Inc, Corteva Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard Inc, Johnson Controls International plc, Central Sprinkler LLC, Fire Products GP Holding LLC, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, Kidde PLC Inc, Chubb Fire LTD, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, National Foam Inc, Angus International Safety Group LTD, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Arkema Inc, BASF Corporation, ChemDesign Products Inc, Dynax Corporation, Clariant Corporation, Chemicals Incorporated, Nation Ford Chemical Company, AGC Inc, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc, Deepwater Chemicals Inc, Archroma Management LLC and Archroma U.S. Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv03941
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by State of Alaska against Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., Central Sprinkler, LLC, Fire Products GP Holding, LLC, and Johnson Controls International, plc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-03940-RMG, 2:21-cv-03941-RMG(Taylor, Brandon)
December 15, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Cary L McDougal on behalf of State of Alaska Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-03940-RMG, 2:21-cv-03941-RMG(McDougal, Cary)
December 15, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Summy on behalf of State of Alaska Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-03940-RMG, 2:21-cv-03941-RMG(Summy, Scott)
December 14, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Scott Hannon on behalf of Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-03941-RMG(Hannon, Kevin)
December 14, 2021 Filing 40 Summons Issued on a Third-Party Complaint as to 3M Company, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc, AGC Inc, Angus International Safety Group LTD, Archroma Management LLC, Archroma U.S. Inc., Arkema Inc, BASF Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Carrier Global Corporation, Central Sprinkler LLC, ChemDesign Products Inc, Chemguard Inc, Chemicals Incorporated, Chubb Fire LTD, Clariant Corporation, Corteva Inc, Deepwater Chemicals Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, Dynax Corporation, EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, Fire Products GP Holding LLC, Johnson Controls International plc, Kidde PLC Inc, Kidde-Fenwal Inc, Nation Ford Chemical Company, National Foam Inc, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Tyco Fire Products LP, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc. (sshe, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Cossich on behalf of State of Alaska Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-03940-RMG, 2:21-cv-03941-RMG(Cossich, Christina)
December 13, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip F Cossich on behalf of State of Alaska Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-03940-RMG, 2:21-cv-03941-RMG(Cossich, Philip)
December 13, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon J Taylor on behalf of State of Alaska Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-03940-RMG, 2:21-cv-03941-RMG(Taylor, Brandon)
December 8, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Luana N Smith on behalf of State of Alaska Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-03940-RMG, 2:21-cv-03941-RMG(Smith, Luana)
December 7, 2021 Filing 35 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alaska, 4:21-cv-00019, Gaston v. State of Alaska, as DSC case 2:21-cv-3941-RMG. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) is open as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re new Case Management Orders and other new documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 21, (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B, 3.C, 3.D, 3.E, 3.F, 4, 4.A, 5.A, 5.B, 5.C, 5.D, 5.E, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 6.D, 6.E, 10.A, 11.A, 11.B, 13.A, 15.A, 16.A, 16.B, 16.C, 18.A, 19.A) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. Please also read NOTICE(s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference will be a Telephone Conference set for 12/17/2021 10:00 AM, before Honorable Richard M Gergel (call-in instructions will be circulated the week of prior to each telephonic status conference). See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, )
December 7, 2021 Filing 33 Case transferred in from District of Alaska; Case Number 4:21-cv-00019. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 6, 2021 Filing 32 TRANSFER ORDER: Transferring 2 action(s) - MDL No. 2873, AK/1:21-cv-00015, AK/4:21-cv-00019. These actions are transferred to the District of South Carolina and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (JLH, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
December 6, 2021 Case transferred to District of South Carolina. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (JLH, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Stay. All proceedings in this matter are stayed until the JPML rules on Plaintiff's motion to vacate and renders a final transfer decision. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 11/24/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
November 19, 2021 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff filed by Barbara Gaston. (Hannon, Kevin) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
November 18, 2021 Filing 29 Notice to Counsel re #28 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Inc. A review of the document submitted at dkt 28 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a CHAMBERS copy of the document has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 5.4 and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a CHAMBERS copy of your filing at dkt 28. The CHAMBERS copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf footer on each page. (JLH, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
November 12, 2021 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15)(Baylous, Michael) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
November 12, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand filed by State of Alaska. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sperbeck, Aaron) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
November 5, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Stay filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6)(Baylous, Michael) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
November 3, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF HEARING SESSION before US Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 3017) - SECTION A (DESIGNATED FOR ORAL ARGUMENT) PANEL HEARING set for 12/2/2021 in Washington, DC. Notices of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument due on or before 11/8/2021. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 10/18/2021. (JLH, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
October 29, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Stay by Third Party Defendants Tyco filed by Barbara Gaston. (Hannon, Kevin) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
October 29, 2021 Filing 23 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. Amendment to #20 Notice of Service List . (Baylous, Michael) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
October 28, 2021 Filing 22 SLG TEXT ORDER: Defendant and Third-Party Plaintiff State of Alaskas Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time at Docket #18 is GRANTED. The deadline to file their opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (Dkt. #15 ) is extended to November 12, 2021. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
October 28, 2021 Filing 21 SLG TEXT ORDER: Third-Party Defendants Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard Inc.s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time at Docket #17 is GRANTED. The deadline to file their opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (Dkt. #15 ) is extended to November 12, 2021. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
October 27, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP (Baylous, Michael) Modified on 10/29/2021 Amended at dkt 23. (JLH, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
October 27, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34)(Baylous, Michael) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
October 27, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Remand by State of Alaska. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sperbeck, Aaron) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
October 27, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Remand by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baylous, Michael) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
October 18, 2021 Filing 16 SLG TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Exceed the Page Limit in Plaintiffs Motion to Remand at Docket #13 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Motion to Remand at Docket #15 is accepted for filing. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
October 15, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand by Barbara Gaston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, Third-Party Complaint, #3 Exhibit C, FAA Advisory Circular, #4 Exhibit D, DOT FAA Literature Review, #5 Exhibit E, FAA CertAlert, #6 Exhibit F, Military Specification)(Hannon, Kevin) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
October 15, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Baylous, Michael) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
October 11, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed by Barbara Gaston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hannon, Kevin) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
September 15, 2021 Filing 12 SLG TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand at Docket #11 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs motion to remand shall be filed no later than October 18, 2021. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
September 14, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, by Barbara Gaston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bataille, Christian) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE re #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin Scott Hannon, at docket #7 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT Certificate of Good Standing by Barbara Gaston re #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Kevin Hannon. (Hannon, Kevin) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 Receipt FBK002020 of 250.00 non-resident attorney payment for Kevin Hannon as to Plaintiff B. Gaston. re #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Kevin Hannon (LMH, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Kevin Hannon by Barbara Gaston.(Hannon, Kevin) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron David Sperbeck on behalf of State of Alaska (Sperbeck, Aaron) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Baylous, Michael) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 JWS TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL. The assigned judge hereby recuses from presiding in this case. The case has been re-assigned by random draw to Hon. Sharon L. Gleason. Henceforth, the case number will be 4:21-cv-00019-SLG. (RMC, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Baylous, Michael) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP from Superior Court for the State of Alaska Fourth Judicial District at Fairbanks, case number 4FA-19-02411 CI. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3118832), filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Baylous, Michael) [Transferred from Alaska on 12/7/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaston v. State of Alaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Gaston
Represented By: Christian Bataille
Represented By: Michael W. Flanigan
Represented By: Kevin Scott Hannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska
Represented By: Aaron David Sperbeck
Represented By: Michael J. Schwarz
Represented By: Brandon J Taylor
Represented By: Cary L McDougal
Represented By: Christina Cossich
Represented By: Luana N Smith
Represented By: Philip F Cossich
Represented By: Scott Summy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: EI DuPont De Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: The Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Dupont De Nemours Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Corteva Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Brewster H. Jamieson
Represented By: Michael Bruce Baylous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Chemguard Inc
Represented By: Brewster H. Jamieson
Represented By: Michael Bruce Baylous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Johnson Controls International plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Central Sprinkler LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Fire Products GP Holding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Kidde PLC Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Chubb Fire LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Carrier Global Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Angus International Safety Group LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Arkema Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ChemDesign Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Dynax Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Clariant Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Chemicals Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Nation Ford Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: AGC Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Archroma Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Archroma U.S. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?