Smith v. Britton-Harr et al
Plaintiff: Dorsey Hayden Smith
Defendant: Patrick Britton-Harr, G Ellsworth Harris, V, Coastal Laboratories Inc, AMS Onsite Inc, James Silliman, James Bauder Silliman and Z Diagnostix LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv03989
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 23 Reason: Refiled to correct for attorney filing user log-in to match signature Corrected Filing Document Number #24 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 2/3/2022 (sshe, )
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Dorsey Hayden Smith.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/10/2022 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit about coastal, #2 Exhibit meet coastal team, #3 Exhibit meet ams team, #4 Exhibit corp filing, #5 Exhibit corp filing amsonsite, #6 Exhibit email from leitess, #7 Exhibit W 4)(Ellis, Michael) Modified on 2/4/2022 to correct filing date and reply due date to original(sshe, ).
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AMS Onsite Inc, Patrick Britton-Harr, Coastal Laboratories Inc, G Ellsworth Harris, V. Response to Motion due by 2/4/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memo in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Exh. A to Memo In Support of Motion)No proposed order.(Umbarger, Joshua)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Dorsey Hayden Smith.(Ellis, Michael)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: Defendants Patrick Britton-Harr, G. Ellsworth Harris V, Coastal Laboratories, Inc., and AMS Onsite, Inc. (moving Defendants) moved to dismiss the complaint for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted. (Dkt. No. 6). The Court gave Plaintiff leave to amend the pleading to cure its purported defect or respond in opposition. (Dkt. No. 16). Plaintiff has filed an amended complaint. (Dkt. No. 18). Therefore, moving Defendants motion to dismiss the complaint is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as MOOT. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/10/22.(ltap, )
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dorsey Hayden Smith. Service due by 4/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit complaint amended, #2 Exhibit order of nov 23, #3 Exhibit order of july 15, #4 Exhibit text 100% comm, #5 Exhibit test fronting 1st, #6 Exhibit pruitt health agmt) (Ellis, Michael)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dorsey Hayden Smith as to Silliman Defendants (Ellis, Michael)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS #6 : Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file either an amended complaint or a response to the instant motion on or before January 8, 2022. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 12/28/21. (ltap, )
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion of Steven Neal Leitess to Appear Pro Hac Vice for AMS Onsite Inc, Patrick Britton-Harr, Coastal Laboratories Inc, G Ellsworth Harris, V. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 12/22/2021.(sshe, )
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven Neal Leitess ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-10250060) by AMS Onsite Inc, Patrick Britton-Harr, Coastal Laboratories Inc, G Ellsworth Harris, V. Response to Motion due by 1/5/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application Affidavit for PHV Admission - Leitess, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order PHV Leitess)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Umbarger, Joshua)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion of Todd William Hesel to Appear Pro Hac Vice for AMS Onsite Inc, Patrick Britton-Harr, Coastal Laboratories Inc, G Ellsworth Harris, V. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 12/22/2021.(sshe, )
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Todd William Hesel ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-10248570) by AMS Onsite Inc, Patrick Britton-Harr, Coastal Laboratories Inc, G Ellsworth Harris, V. Response to Motion due by 1/4/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application Affidavit for PHV Admission - Hesel, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order PHV Hesel)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Umbarger, Joshua)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 4, 5 Reason: Filing user refiled to correct for attorney signature document and log-in (clerk refiled as of original date filed to correct for event type as verified by filing user) Corrected Filing Document Numbers #8 , #9 Filing date is that of original filing: 12/15/2021 (sshe, )
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AMS Onsite Inc, Patrick Britton-Harr, Coastal Laboratories Inc, G Ellsworth Harris, V. Response to Motion due by 1/4/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memo in Support of Motion)No proposed order.(Umbarger, Joshua)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Coastal. Party not an infant, not incompetent, nor in the military, has been served on 10/25/2021 by Dorsey Hayden Smith.(Ellis, Michael) Filing corrected for event type by clerk (refiled by filing user to correct for original attorney filing user signature log-in), as of original filing date (sshe, )
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to AMS Onsite Inc. Party not an infant, not incompetent, nor in the military, has been served on 10/25/2021 by Dorsey Hayden Smith.(Ellis, Michael) Filing corrected for event type by clerk (refiled by filing user to correct for original attorney filing user signature log-in), as of original filing date (sshe, )
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by G Ellsworth Harris, V.(sshe, )
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-10-04808. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10228001), filed by G Ellsworth Harris, V. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit Dismissal Order, #3 Exhibit Consent to Removal)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Britton-Harr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorsey Hayden Smith
Represented By: Michael Holland Ellis, Jr
Represented By: O Grady Query
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Britton-Harr
Represented By: David W Overstreet
Represented By: Joshua Hugh Umbarger
Represented By: Steven N Leitess
Represented By: Todd William Hesel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Ellsworth Harris, V
Represented By: David W Overstreet
Represented By: Joshua Hugh Umbarger
Represented By: Steven N Leitess
Represented By: Todd William Hesel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Laboratories Inc
Represented By: David W Overstreet
Represented By: Joshua Hugh Umbarger
Represented By: Steven N Leitess
Represented By: Todd William Hesel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMS Onsite Inc
Represented By: David W Overstreet
Represented By: Joshua Hugh Umbarger
Represented By: Steven N Leitess
Represented By: Todd William Hesel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Silliman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Bauder Silliman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z Diagnostix LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?