Mazyck v. Al Cannon Detention Center
Petitioner: Tyrone Deon Mazyck
Respondent: Al Cannon Detention Center
Case Number: 2:2022cv00010
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Tyrone Deon Mazyck. Response to Motion due by 2/7/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(dgar)
January 24, 2022 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 8 Terminate Deadlines, Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Tyrone Deon Mazyck 29642 Al Cannon Detention Center 3841 Leeds Ave. North Charleston, SC 29405. (dgar)
January 24, 2022 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER. On January 11, 2022, the undersigned issued #3 Proper Form Order, notifying Petitioner that the Court could not authorize service of his petition because he had not paid the filing fee or sought leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court was directed to provide Petitioner with a blank Form AO 240, Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. It appears there was an administrative error and Petitioner received the wrong form. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court has re-sent Petitioner the correct form, and the undersigned hereby extends Petitioners deadline to complete and return said form, or to otherwise pay the filing fee, to 2/14/2022. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 01/24/2022. (msaw, )
January 20, 2022 Filing 7 ***Correct Form AO240 placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Tyrone Deon Mazyck 29642 Al Cannon Detention Center 3841 Leeds Ave. North Charleston, SC 29405. (dgar)
January 20, 2022 Filing 6 Letter from Tyrone D. Mazyck. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dgar)
January 11, 2022 Filing 4 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #3 Proper Form Order, and blank Form AO240 placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Tyrone Deon Mazyck 29642 Al Cannon Detention Center 3841 Leeds Ave. North Charleston, SC 29405. (dgar) Modified on 1/11/2022 to include docket text(dgar, ).
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 2/1/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 1/11/2022. (dgar)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Tyrone Deon Mazyck. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dgar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mazyck v. Al Cannon Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tyrone Deon Mazyck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Al Cannon Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?