Goss, Sr. v. Kendell
Petitioner: Darrell L. Goss, Sr.
Respondent: Brian Kendell
Case Number: 2:2022cv00103
Filed: January 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Filing 9 OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendation by Darrell L. Goss, Sr. Reply to Objections due by 3/2/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Common Plea Order, #2 Envelope)(apsn)
February 3, 2022 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #6 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Darrell L. Goss, Sr., 7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Darrell L. Goss, Sr. 305517 Leiber Correctional Institution PO Box 205 136 Wilburn Avenue Ridgeville, SC 29472. (dgar)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REFERENCE ORDER #6 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 2/3/2022.(dgar)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk, directing respondent not to answer and directing the petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 2/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(dgar)
February 3, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned RECOMMENDS that the Courtsummarily dismiss Goss's petition, without prejudice and without requiring the Warden to file a return. Objections to R&R due by 2/17/2022 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 2/3/2022. (dgar)
January 12, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Darrell L. Goss, Sr.. Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(dgar)
January 12, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Darrell L. Goss, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dgar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goss, Sr. v. Kendell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darrell L. Goss, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Kendell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?